Wadsworth v. Basin I E, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kimberley H Tyson |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01223 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Basin I E, Inc.
P.O. Box P.O. Box 120
Vernal, UT 84078 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/26 9:10 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-1223 Closed. (cag) |
||
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Service Executed On: Basin I E, Inc. on October 24, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued on Basin I E, Inc. Answer Due 11/25/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 by David V. Wadsworth against Basin I E, Inc.. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Service Executed On: Basin I E, Inc. on October 23, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued on Basin I E, Inc. Answer Due 11/21/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 by David V. Wadsworth against Basin I E, Inc.. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee
Thu 08/08 10:57 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-01223 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Basin I E, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Hartl, Theodore) |