Wadsworth v. P2ES Holdings, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kimberley H Tyson |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01225 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
P2ES Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/04 8:18 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-1225 KHT Closed. (rp) |
||
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/20/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . (mcs) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 02/18 3:36 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-1225 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 3/3/2020. (mcs) |
||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/24/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Granting Motion to Continue Abeyance . (rp) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Status Report Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/20/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order Granting Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance . Document due by 1/21/2020 for7 , (rp) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons Service Executed On: P2ES Holdings, LLC on 10/15/19 Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued on P2ES Holdings, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 by David V. Wadsworth against P2ES Holdings, LLC. Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Receipt of Filing Fee
Thu 08/29 6:50 PM
Receipt of Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee - $350.00 by MB. Receipt Number 305739. (admin) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee
Thu 08/08 11:01 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-01225 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against P2ES Holdings, LLC. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Conrardy, Aaron) |