Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:19-ap-01226
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Terminated:Nov 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc.
2149 W 1000 N
Roosevelt, UT 84066
Represented By
Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
Represented By
Theodore J. Hartl
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Aaron J. Conrardy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, November 02, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/02 10:29 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-1226 KHT Closed. (rp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/16 10:41 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Wed 10/14 8:41 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/14 8:42 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-1226 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 10/29/2020. (rp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
19 19 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/09 1:16 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Amended Complaint,7 Amended Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Saturday, February 08, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/08 10:26 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Other Order
Thursday, February 06, 2020
17 17 order Other Order Thu 02/06 11:37 AM
Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Motion to Strike Jury Demand Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 16 Motion
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
16 16 motion Motion Tue 01/21 12:22 PM
Motion For to Strike Jury Demand Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, December 25, 2019
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/25 10:33 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Scheduling Order
Monday, December 23, 2019
14 14 order Scheduling Order (Adversary) Mon 12/23 11:49 AM
Scheduling Order RE: Related [+]. Discovery due by 6/10/2020 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 7/8/2020 for1 , IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial date will be set, if necessary, afterexpiration of all pretrial deadlines and after the Court has ruled upon any dispositivemotions or upon request of the parties. (cag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, December 20, 2019
13 13 misc 7026 (f) Report Fri 12/20 11:18 AM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc., David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] 11 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Saturday, November 23, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/23 10:30 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 11/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Thursday, November 21, 2019
11 11 order Compliance With Rules Thu 11/21 12:51 PM
ORDER FOR COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 7026,FED.R.BANKR.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 12/21/2019 for1 , (rp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/21 12:37 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Patrick W. Carothers on behalf of Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc. Related [+]. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 24, 2019
9 9 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 10/24 4:08 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc. on October 24, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 10/24 3:47 PM
Summons Issued on Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc. Answer Due 11/25/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 3:46 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc.. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
6 6 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 10/23 4:44 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc. on October 23, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
5 5 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 10/22 4:40 PM
Summons Issued on Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc. Answer Due 11/21/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 4:39 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc.. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Thursday, August 29, 2019
3 3 court Receipt of Filing Fee Thu 08/29 6:50 PM
Receipt of Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee - $350.00 by MB. Receipt Number 305739. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Thu 08/08 11:03 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 11:02 AM
Adversary case 19-01226 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Arnie Powell Trucking, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]