Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:19-ap-01227
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Terminated:Feb 28, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bill Barret Corp.
1099 18th Street
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Bill Barret Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
Represented By
Theodore J. Hartl
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Aaron J. Conrardy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, February 28, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/28 9:08 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-1227 KHT Closed. (rp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Thu 02/13 9:52 AM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of Highpoint Resources, f/k/a Bill Barrett Corp., David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Amended Complaint,6 Amended Complaint
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 02/13 9:59 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-1227 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 2/27/2020. (rp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/04 10:31 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, December 02, 2019
10 10 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 10:46 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Bill Barret Corp. Answer Due 12/9/2019; Highpoint Resources, f/k/a Bill Barrett Corp. Answer Due 12/9/2019 Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Friday, November 22, 2019
9 9 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 11/22 8:22 PM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Lars H. Fuller on behalf of Highpoint Resources, f/k/a Bill Barrett Corp. Related [+]. (Fuller, Lars)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, October 24, 2019
8 8 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 10/24 4:44 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Highpoint Resources, formerly known as Bill Barret Corp., on October 24, 2019 Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 10/24 3:40 PM
Summons Issued on Highpoint Resources, f/k/a Bill Barrett Corp. Answer Due 11/25/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 3:40 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against Highpoint Resources, f/k/a Bill Barrett Corp.. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
5 5 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 10/22 4:36 PM
Summons Issued on Bill Barret Corp. Answer Due 11/21/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/22 4:36 PM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 Related [+] by David V. Wadsworth against Bill Barret Corp.. Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-] covery of Money/Property - 547 Preference1 Complaint
Thursday, August 29, 2019
3 3 court Receipt of Filing Fee Thu 08/29 6:50 PM
Receipt of Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee - $350.00 by MB. Receipt Number 305739. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Thu 08/08 11:05 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 11:05 AM
Adversary case 19-01227 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Bill Barret Corp.. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Hartl, Theodore)
Related: [-]