Wadsworth v. Water Disposal Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-17465
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kimberley H Tyson |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01230 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Water Disposal Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 11/02 10:31 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-1230 KHT Closed. (rp) |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . (rp) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 10/14 8:39 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-1230 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 10/29/2020. (rp) |
||
Friday, October 09, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Saturday, February 08, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/08/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Motion to Strike Jury Demand . (rp) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Motion For to Strike Jury Demand Filed by Theodore J. Hartl on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Hartl, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, January 20, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lindsay Riley on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Riley, Lindsay) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Scheduling Order RE: . Discovery due by 6/10/2020 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 7/8/2020 for1 , IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial date will be set, if necessary, afterexpiration of all pretrial deadlines and after the Court has ruled upon any dispositivemotions or upon request of the parties. (cag) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth . (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Saturday, November 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/23/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER FOR COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 7026,FED.R.BANKR.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) . Rules Compliance due by 12/21/2019 for , (rp) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Patrick W. Carothers on behalf of Water Disposal Inc. . (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons Service Executed On: Water Disposal Inc. on 10/15/19 Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued on Water Disposal Inc. Answer Due 11/14/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 12 by David V. Wadsworth against Water Disposal Inc.. Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Conrardy, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Receipt of Filing Fee
Thu 08/29 6:50 PM
Receipt of Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee - $350.00 by MB. Receipt Number 305740. (admin) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee
Thu 08/08 11:29 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-01230 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Water Disposal Inc.. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 12/6/2019 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Conrardy, Aaron) |