Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02976
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-11869
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 04, 2020 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
KENDRIC PERKINS
Represented By
Byron M. Forrest
Forrest Cressy & James, LLC
contact info
Donald David Reichert
Bruno & Bruno
contact info
Joseph M. Bruno
Bruno & Bruno
contact info
Sara Eliza James
Forrest Cressy & James, LLC
contact info
JOSEPH M BRUNO, SR
Bruno & Bruno - New Orleans La
contact info
Markita S Hawkins
Bruno & Bruno
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 13, 2019
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/13 3:46 PM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KENDRIC PERKINS. (BRUNO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/08 1:53 PM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11869. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/08 9:41 AM
Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Florida. MDL case number is 2885. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
4 4 transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/08 9:37 AM
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2885. (mp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
3 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC.(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/8/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, July 25, 2019
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/8/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7773578) filed by Kendric Perkins.Attorney Joseph M. Bruno added to party Kendric Perkins(pty:pla).(Bruno, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/8/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons