Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11781

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-bk-11782
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2019
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cornucopia Oil & Gas Company, LLC
188 W. Northern Lights Blvd. Suite 620
Anchorage, AK 99503
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 31, 2024 4:26 PM EST
Accountant
Carr, Riggs & Ingram, LLC
Attorney
Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP
Attorney
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
Attorney
Stoel Rives LLP
Attorney
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
Interested Party
David Elder
Interested Party
Energy Capital Partners Mezzanine Opportunites Fund A, LP
Liquidating Trustee
Litigation Trustee
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Steven D. Adler
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Other Prof.
Ankura Consulting Group, LLC
Other Prof.
Seaport Global Securities LLC
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Juliet M. Sarkessian
U.S. Trustee'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Claims Agent
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
Terminated: 10/12/2020
www.kroll.com/kra 1 World Trade Center 31st Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Monday, January 27, 2025
143 143 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 01/27 5:25 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Final Decree And Order (I) Closing The Chapter 11 Case Of Cornucopia Oil & Gas Company, LLC And (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Litigation Trustee. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 142
142 142 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 12:23 PM
Final Decree And Order (I) Closing The Chapter 11 Case Of Cornucopia Oil & Gas Company, LLC And (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 1/27/2025. (CMB)
Related: [-] 135 ,141
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/27 2:58 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
141 141 misc Certificate of No Objection Thu 01/23 1:01 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of the Litigation Trustee and the Reorganized Debtor for Entry of a Final Decree (I) Closing the Chapter 11 Case of Cornucopia Oil & Gas Company, LLC and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Litigation Trustee. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 135
Att: 1 Exhibit A