Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-04575
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2019
Terminated:Nov 19, 2019
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:19-cv-02548
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 05, 2020 12:29 AM PST
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
Represented By
Daniel M. Meyers
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Dominique Savinelli
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
James Patrick O'shea, Ii
Law Office Of William P. Murphy
contact info
Defendant
Olga Frankfurt
Represented By
Marie Kathleen Lynch
Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Daniel M. Meyers
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Dominique Savinelli
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Eric Gordon Lasker
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
James Patrick O'shea, Ii
Law Office Of William P. Murphy
contact info
Thomas Joseph Dammrich, II
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation
Represented By
Marie Kathleen Lynch
Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Northwestern Memorial Hospital
Represented By
Marie Kathleen Lynch
Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KEITH CICHY
Represented By
David Joseph Gallagher
Motherway And Napleton, LLP
contact info
David J. Gallagher
Motherway & Napleton, LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 19 2019
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 191: GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/19/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)

Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Monday, December 09, 2019
40 40 misc Receipt Wed 12/11 10:26 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of remand documents received from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL. (fabS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
39 39 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 11/20 9:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (fabS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
38 38 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 11/19 8:19 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 191: GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/19/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Closed Wed 11/20 11:12 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 11/19/19 in the MDL 3:16-md-2741 VC master file (dkt. #7844), civil case no. 3:19-cv-04575 VC is terminated. cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2019
37 37 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 10/14 10:12 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the hearing scheduled for 10/17/2019 re (5228) Motion to Remand re Cichy v. Bayer Corporation, et al . The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motion and responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
36 36 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 09/10 11:17 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byKEITH CICHY.(Gallagher, David)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION to Remand
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
35 35 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 09/03 1:54 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byMonsanto Company. (Lasker, Eric)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION to Remand
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
34 34 motion Remand Tue 08/20 9:51 AM
MOTION to Remand filed by KEITH CICHY. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/3/2019. Replies due by 9/10/2019.(Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 5 Notice of Motion,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2019
33 33 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 08/09 1:16 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02548. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 08/09 1:19 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Illinois (Chicago), 1:19-cv-02548, Cichy v. Bayer Corporation, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-04575 VC cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
32 32 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the electronic record. (cc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
31 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to U.S.D.C. for the Northern District of California(cc, )
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2741 Conditional Transfer Order filed 8/2/2019. (cc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
30 30 REPLY by Olga Frankfurt, Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation, Northwestern Memorial Hospital to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Olga Frankfurt, Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation, Northwestern Memorial Hospital 23 , response to motion,29 (Lynch, Marie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
29 29 RESPONSE by Keith Cichy to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Olga Frankfurt, Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation, Northwestern Memorial Hospital 23 (Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
28 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to dismiss pursuant to rule 12(b)(6)23 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 6/26/19. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 7/10/19. Plaintiff's motion to remand14 is taken under advisement. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
27 27 REPLY by Keith Cichy to response in opposition to motion26 (Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
26 26 19 pgs MEMORANDUM by Monsanto Companyin Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to remand.14 (Dammrich, Thomas) (Docket Text Modified on 5/29/2019) (ek, ).
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
25 25 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation, Northwestern Memorial Hospital (Lynch, Marie)
Related: [-]
24 24 NOTICE of Motion by Marie Kathleen Lynch for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim23 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Lynch, Marie)
Related: [-]
23 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Olga Frankfurt, Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation, Northwestern Memorial Hospital(Lynch, Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
22 22 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion for Remand held on 05/07/19 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Order Number: 34669. Court Reporter Contact Information: Lisa Breiter, lisa_breiter@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 818-6683.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 5/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (Breiter, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
21 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant Monsanto Company's motion to stay proceedings18 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to remand14 is taken under advisement. Defendant's response shall be filed by 5/28/19. Plaintiff's reply in support shall be filed by 6/4/19. Motion hearing date of 5/9/19 is stricken. Initial status hearing previously set for 6/5/19 is stricken. The court will rule electronically and set further dates in the ruling. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
20 20 RESPONSE by Keith Cichyin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Monsanto Company to stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling on Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation 18 (Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Joseph Dammrich, II for presentment of motion to stay,18 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Dammrich, Thomas)
Related: [-]
18 18 MOTION by Defendant Monsanto Company to stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling on Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation(Dammrich, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Tag-Along and Schedule of Actions,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Aden Conditional Transfer Order
17 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Monsanto Company by Thomas Joseph Dammrich, II (Dammrich, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
16 16 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Gallagher for presentment of motion to remand14 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
15 15 12 pgs MEMORANDUM by Keith Cichy in support of motion to remand14 (Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
14 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Keith Cichy to remand (Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
13 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' agreed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead11 is granted to 5/20/19. Initial status hearing previously set for 5/15/19 is stricken and reset to 6/5/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
12 12 NOTICE of Motion by Marie Kathleen Lynch for presentment of extension of time11 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Lynch, Marie)
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION by Defendants Olga Frankfurt, Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation, Northwestern Memorial Hospital for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint at law (Lynch, Marie)
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Olga Frankfurt, Northwestern Medical Faculty Foundation, Northwestern Memorial Hospital by Marie Kathleen Lynch (Lynch, Marie)
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 5/15/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
8 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company(Meyers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Keith Cichy by David J. Gallagher (Gallagher, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
Related: [-]
5 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MONSANTO COMPANY (Meyers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MONSANTO COMPANY by Daniel M. Meyers (Meyers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Meyers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L002422) filed by MONSANTO COMPANY Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15719270. (Meyers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
Related: [-]