New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:19-cv-04583
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Terminated:Jul 10, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 04, 2020 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Asha Joshua
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Defendant
Beena Joshua
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chinnamma Joshua
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Defendant
Finney Joshua
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Joshua
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Defendant
Philip Joshua
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Defendant
Betsy Koshy
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Defendant
Binny Koshy
Represented By
Mark Liam McKew
The Law Offices Of Mark Mckew, PLLC
contact info
Elliot G. Sagor
Mintz & Gold LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eliyamma Jose
Represented By
Sumani Vani Lanka
The Legal Aid Society
contact info
Young Woo Lee
The Legal Aid Society
contact info
Alan Mansfield
Greenburg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Noah Lindenfeld
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Janet E. Sabel
The Legal Aid Society
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/19 12:13 PM
ORDER granting45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/19/2020. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
45 45 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/07 12:54 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Eliyamma Jose. (Lanka, Sumani)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/10 8:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the settlement in principle this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to its reinstatement should the settlement not be consummated. Barring any further requests for an extension by August 10, this dismissal shall deemed with prejudice.Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/10/2020. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
44 44 misc Status Report Thu 07/09 7:17 AM
STATUS REPORT by Eliyamma Jose (Lanka, Sumani)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 07/09 8:59 AM
ORDER re44 Status Report filed by Eliyamma Jose: In light of Plaintiff's representation that the parties have reached a settlement in principal, the remainder of the discovery schedule set on June 8th is stayed and counsel are directed to electronically filed the stipulation of settlement and dismissal with the Court no later than August 10th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/9/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
43 43 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 06/26 7:23 AM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 6/23/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: : Lindenfeld & Lankafor Plaintiff; Carman, McHue for Defendants. Settlement discussions were held and the parties made significant progress. Parties will continue to discuss settlement and will advise the Court by July 10th by letter if the have reached a settlement. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
42 42 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 06/26 7:16 AM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 6/22/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Lindenfeld & Lankafor Plaintiff; Carman, McHue for Defendants. Settlement discussions were held and the parties made significant progress. Continued to June 23rd at 3:45 p.m. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/19 4:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eliyamma Jose, filed by Eliyamma Jose. (Lanka, Sumani)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
order Order on Motion for Hearing Tue 06/09 6:59 AM
ORDER granting40 Motion for Hearing: A settlement conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on June 22, 2020 before the undersigned by phone with all counsel only. Counsel for Plaintiff shall call into the conference at 10:00 a.m. and counsel for Defendants shall call into the conference at 10:30 a.m. Principals shall be available by phone for the duration of the conference should the Court require their participation. Counsel are directed to contact the Court PRIOR TO JUNE 22ND to obtain the conference call-in information. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/9/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
40 40 motion Hearing Mon 06/08 3:06 PM
MOTION for Hearing (Settlement Conference) by Beena Joshua, Chinnamma Joshua, Finney Joshua, Jacob Joshua, Betsy Koshy, Binny Koshy. (McKew, Mark)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 06/08 7:38 AM
ORDER granting39 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The proposed amended discovery schedule is approved as follows: Deadline to joint new parties or amend pleadings - June 19, 2020; First requests for production of documents and interrogatories - July 30, 2020; All fact discovery to be completed by November 30, 2020; Exchange of expert reports by December 30, 2020; Expert depositions to be completed by January 29, 2021; All discovery to be completed by March 1, 2021; and, the final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is April 1, 2021. An in-person status conference will be held before the undersigned in Hearing Room N504 of the North Wing of the Brooklyn Federal Courthouse at 11:00 a.m. on December 9, 2020. Counsel for all parties must attend. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/8/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
39 39 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 06/05 4:09 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Proposed Schedule) by Eliyamma Jose. (Lanka, Sumani)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
38 38 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/21 6:16 PM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 5/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Lindenfeld & Lanka for Plaintiff; Carman & McKew for Defendants. Settlement discussions were held but the parties were unable to reach a disposition at this time. Parties will move forward with discovery and advise the Court when a further settlement conference would be productive. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
37 37 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Tue 05/19 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by James M. Carman (Carman, James)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/19 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Carman on behalf of Asha Joshua, Philip Joshua (aty to be noticed) (Carman, James)
Related: [-]
order Order Re: Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Tue 05/19 5:44 PM
Order re: Notice of Consent to Change Attorney. Attorney Mark Liam McKew terminated for Defendants Philip Joshua & Asha Joshua. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/19/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
order Order(Other) Mon 05/18 1:45 PM
ORDER: The settlement conference scheduled for May 20th at 12:00 p.m. will be held by phone. Counsel for Plaintiff shall call the Court at 12:00 p.m. with the client on the line and counsel for defendants shall call the Court at 12:30 p.m. with clients on the line. Counsel shall contact the Court prior to May 20th to obtain the conference call-in information. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/18/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
35 35 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 04/15 8:51 AM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Eliyamma Jose. (Lanka, Sumani)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order(Other) Wed 04/15 3:31 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference scheduled for April 20th will instead be held at 12:00 p.m. on May 20, 2020. If by the next conference date, circumstances still exist which limit personal appearances for proceedings, the Court will hold the settlement conference by phone with all parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/15/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 03/20 7:59 AM
ORDER granting34 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The settlement conference scheduled for March 23rd will instead be held at 10:30 a.m. on April 20, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 710 before the undersigned. Counsel shall file updated settlement positions, if any, by April 18th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/20/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
34 34 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 03/19 3:18 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference from 3/23/20 to 4/20/20 by Eliyamma Jose. (Mansfield, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/11 10:18 AM
The Court is rescheduling the March 16th settlement conference to 11:00 a.m. on March 23rd. Counsel shall confirm this new conference date and time with each other. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/11/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
notice Notice(Other) Thu 03/05 1:34 PM
NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Tiscione will handle all proceedings scheduled for March 16, 2020 in Central Islip. Accordingly, the conference scheduled for 11:00 a.m. on March 16th will be held in Courtroom 710 of the Central Islip Courthouse located at 100 Federal Plaza. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 03/03 2:17 PM
ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion for Settlement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/3/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 03/03 2:18 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/3/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
33 33 motion Protective Order Mon 03/02 7:22 PM
Letter MOTION for Protective Order by Eliyamma Jose. (Mansfield, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
32 32 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/04 2:08 PM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 2/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Mansfield, Lindenfeld, Lanka for Plaintiff; McKew for Defendants. Settlement discussions were held but the parties were unable to reach a disposition at this time. Defendants will voluntarily turn over financial records and the Court will hold a further settlement conference on March 16, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (FTR Log #11:25 - 11:26, 1:38 - 1:39.) (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/31 7:37 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliot G. Sagor terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/31/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone Fri 01/31 7:40 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Plaintiff Jose is permitted to appear by phone for the February 4th conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/31/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
29 29 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/30 11:04 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Asha Joshua, Beena Joshua, Chinnamma Joshua, Finney Joshua, Jacob Joshua, Philip Joshua, Betsy Koshy, Binny Koshy. (McKew, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elliot G. Sagor
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/29 4:00 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown. Judge Margo K. Brodie no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/28 1:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by All Defendants. (McKew, Mark)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Appear by Telephone Tue 01/28 1:24 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Eliyamma Jose. (Mansfield, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
26 26 misc Letter Mon 01/27 8:47 PM
Letter opposing letter request filed by plaintiff on 01/27/2020 by Asha Joshua, Beena Joshua, Chinnamma Joshua, Finney Joshua, Jacob Joshua, Philip Joshua, Betsy Koshy, Binny Koshy (McKew, Mark)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Letter Mon 01/27 12:32 PM
Letter by Eliyamma Jose (Mansfield, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
24 24 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/25 2:13 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Mansfield, Lindenfeld & Lanka for Plaintiff; McKew & Sagor for Defendants. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines: Deadline for completion of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures - 12/5/19; Completion of Phase I discovery - 1/21/20; Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 3/19/20; First requests for production of documents and interrogatories due by - 4/3/20; All fact discovery to be completed by 6/22/20; Exchange of expert reports - 7/22/20; Expert depositions completed by - 8/21/20; All discovery completed by - 8/21/20; Final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice - 10/5/20. An in-person settlement conference will be held on February 4, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than February 1, 2020. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (FTR Log #11:11 - 11:17.) (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
23 23 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 11/19 12:00 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Eliyamma Jose (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
22 22 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/21 1:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m on November 21, 2019 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than November 19th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/21/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/21 9:52 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (McKew, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot G. Sagor on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Sagor, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/05 3:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Asha Joshua, Beena Joshua, Chinnamma Joshua, Finney Joshua, Jacob Joshua, Philip Joshua, Betsy Koshy, Binny Koshy. (McKew, Mark)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Liam McKew on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (McKew, Mark)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/05 6:49 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to October 18th to Answer for All Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/5/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Asha Joshua served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Beena Joshua served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Betsy Koshy served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Binny Koshy served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Finney Joshua served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Jacob Joshua served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Chinnamma Joshua served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 1:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyamma Jose. Philip Joshua served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 08/12 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 08/12 10:49 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/12 10:49 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 08/09 2:30 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Young Woo Lee on behalf of Eliyamma Jose (aty to be noticed) (Lee, Young)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Lindenfeld on behalf of Eliyamma Jose (aty to be noticed) (Lindenfeld, Noah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sumani Vani Lanka on behalf of Eliyamma Jose (aty to be noticed) (Lanka, Sumani)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
3 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Eliyamma Jose (Mansfield, Alan)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Eliyamma Jose (Mansfield, Alan)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Asha Joshua, Beena Joshua, Chinnamma Joshua, Finney Joshua, Jacob Joshua, Philip Joshua, Betsy Koshy, Binny Koshy filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11745051 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Eliyamma Jose. (Mansfield, Alan)
Related: [-]