Original Case: 2:12-md-02325

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv.pr-01850
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2019
Terminated:Sep 23, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2019 4:31 AM EDT
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED, Pelvic Repair System Products Liability Litigation
Appellant
ANDERSON LAW OFFICES
Represented By
Webster J. Arceneaux III
LEWIS GLASSER, PLLC
contact info
Louis E. Grube
PAUL W. FLOWERS CO., LPA
contact info
Richard Lee Gottlieb
LEWIS GLASSER, PLLC
contact info
Paul W. Flowers
PAUL W. FLOWERS CO., LPA
contact info
Appellant
BENJAMIN H. ANDERSON
Represented By
Webster J. Arceneaux III
LEWIS GLASSER, PLLC
contact info
Louis E. Grube
PAUL W. FLOWERS CO., LPA
contact info
Richard Lee Gottlieb
LEWIS GLASSER, PLLC
contact info
Paul W. Flowers
PAUL W. FLOWERS CO., LPA
contact info
Appellee
COMMON BENEFIT FEE AND COST COMMITTEE
Represented By
Raymond S. Franks II
BAILEY & GLASSER, LLP
contact info
Benjamin L. Bailey
BAILEY & GLASSER, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/24/2019 4:26 AM EDT
Friday, August 09, 2019
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:12-md-02325. Case manager: TFischer. 19-1850 TF [Entered: 08/09/2019 09:26 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs ORDER filed [1000564001] consolidating case 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 with 19-1849 L).. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Flowers, Grube. 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 TF [Entered: 08/09/2019 10:13 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1000563911-2] case , [1] case , [1000563930-2] case , [1000563946-2] case , [1000563964-2] case , [1000563969-2] case , [1000563979-2] case Originating case number: 2:10-md-02187. Mailed to: Flowers, Grube. 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 TF [Entered: 08/09/2019 10:17 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 30+ pgs MOTION by Common Benefit Fee and Cost Committee in 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 to dismiss appeal [4]. Date and method of service: 08/09/2019 ecf, US mail. [1000564100] 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 Raymond Franks [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:14 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Common Benefit Fee and Cost Committee in 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000564103] 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 Raymond Franks [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:15 AM]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs NOTICE ISSUED to Benjamin H. Anderson and Anderson Law Offices in 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [4] Response due: 08/19/2019.[1000564117]. Mailed to: Paul W. Flowers, Louis E. Grube. 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 DL [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:25 AM]
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Benjamin H. Anderson and Anderson Law Offices in 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000564815] 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 DL [Entered: 08/12/2019 09:59 AM]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION by Benjamin H. Anderson and Anderson Law Offices in 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 for stay pending appeal. Date and method of service: 08/09/2019 ecf. [1000564836] 19-1849 19-1850 19-1851 19-1853 19-1855 19-1856 19-1857 DL [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:16 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs MOTION
Att: 2 41 pgs Exhibit 1 - Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment
Att: 3 24 pgs Exhibit 2 - Response to Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit 3 - Reply in Support of Stay of Execution of Judgment
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit 4 - Order denying Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment
Att: 6 238 pgs Exhibit 5 - Response to Motion to Dismiss (Prior Case: 19-1224 L))