Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-70556

Illinois Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary P Gorman
Case #: 3:19-ap-07029
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2019
Terminated:Dec 03, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ronald Carmona
8 Flint Ct.
Bloomington, IL 61705
Represented By
Ronald Carmona
contact info
Plaintiff
Darla Carmona
27 Cloverhill Circle
Bloomington, IL 61705
Represented By
James T Finegan
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/03 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 3:19-ap-7029 Closed (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 11/20 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Judgment
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/20 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Cancellation of Hearing Notice
Monday, November 18, 2019
15 15 crtntc Cancellation of Hearing Notice Mon 11/18 1:13 PM
Court Notice re Cancellation of Hearing Related [+] (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Darla Carmona
14 14 order Judgment Mon 11/18 1:12 PM
Agreed Order . (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 11/18 1:14 PM
Disposition of Adversary 19-07029 Close Adversary: 12/2/2019. (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/12 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Pre-Trial Adversary Hearing Notice and Order - Call In
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/11 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Striking Incorrect or Incomplete Document
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
11 11 order Pre-Trial Adversary Hearing Notice and Pre-Trial Order - Call In Tue 09/10 12:08 PM
Pre-Trial Adversary Hearing Notice and PreTrial Order - Call In; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1829 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 8878507. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 01:30 PM at Telephone Conference-Springfield,IL-MPG. (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Darla Carmona
Monday, September 09, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/09 4:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by A. Christopher Cox of Cox & Associates, LLC on behalf of Ronald Carmona. (Cox, A.)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/09 4:07 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by A. Christopher Cox of Cox & Associates, LLC on behalf of Ronald Carmona Related [+]. (Cox, A.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-07029 (64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)): Complaint by Darla Carmona against Ronald Carmona filed by Plaintiff Darla Carmona
8 8 order Striking Incorrect or Incomplete Document (AP) Mon 09/09 3:57 PM
Order Striking Incorrect or Incomplete Document Related [+]. (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 7 Response filed by Defendant Ronald Carmona
7 7 misc Response (Other than Motions) Mon 09/09 3:30 PM
STRICKEN BY DOC #8 Response Filed by A. Christopher Cox of Cox & Associates, LLC on behalf of Ronald Carmona Related [+]. (Cox, A.) Modified on 9/9/2019 (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Mon 09/09 3:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by A. Christopher Cox of Cox & Associates, LLC on behalf of Ronald Carmona. (Cox, A.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 11, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/11 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 09, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/09 2:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ronald Carmona 8/9/2019 (Finegan, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 crtntc Notice re: Filing of Complaint, Service of Summons and Default (Text Only) Fri 08/09 1:54 PM
(Text-only notice, no associated pdf) NOTICE RE: FILING OF COMPLAINT, SERVICE OF SUMMONS, AND DEFAULT. An adversary complaint has been filed. Selection of the proper "nature of suit" when docketing the complaint is important. Please verify that you have selected all actions that apply to your complaint and no others. For more information about selecting the appropriate "nature of suit" when filing a complaint, see the Court's procedures available on the Court's website or click the link below. A summons has been issued for service on the Defendant(s). The Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint within 7 days of issuance. If not served within 7 days, an alias summons must be requested. It is the sole responsibility of the Plaintiff to determine whether an alias summons is needed. Failure to effectuate proper service within 90 days of the filing of the complaint may result in dismissal. Proof of service is required and should be filed using the "Summons Service Executed" docket event. In the event the Defendant fails to appear and respond to the complaint, the Court will enter a default only upon the filing of a motion for default judgment and satisfaction of all other requirements under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. The Court will no longer request motions for default or default judgment from parties. For more information about the service of summons and complaint and obtaining default judgments, see the Court's procedures for[LINK:Adversary Proceedings: Filing Complaint, Service of Summons, and Motions for Default Judgments] available on the Court's website. (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/09 1:52 PM
Summons Issued on Ronald Carmona Answer Due 9/8/2019 (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/09 1:34 PM
Adversary case 19-07029 (64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)): Complaint by Darla Carmona against Ronald Carmona (Finegan, James)
Related: [-]