Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03050
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2020 3:21 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DAVID HAIGHT
Represented By
ZACHARY SCOTT BOWER
Carella Byrne Cecchi Etc - Miami Fl
contact info
MICHAEL EDWARD PEDERSON
Weitz & Luxenberg Pc - New York Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/05 5:27 PM
Short Form Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by DAVID HAIGHT. (PEDERSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL EDWARD PEDERSON on behalf of DAVID HAIGHT (PEDERSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 10/11 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by DAVID HAIGHT (MAKHAIL, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/18 8:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID HAIGHT. AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (BOWER, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/18 8:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID HAIGHT. AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (BOWER, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/18 8:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID HAIGHT. AEARO HOLDING LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (BOWER, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/18 8:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID HAIGHT. 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (BOWER, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 7:49 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 08/19 3:13 PM
NOTICE by DAVID HAIGHT (BOWER, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to 3M Company,
Att: 2 Summons to 3M Occupational Safety LLC,
Att: 3 Summons to Aearo Holding LLC,
Att: 4 Summons to Aearo Intermediate LLC,
Att: 5 Summons to Aearo LLC,
Att: 6 Summons to Aearo Technologies LLC
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Wed 08/14 7:51 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action Related [+]. (djb)
Related: [-] vised 6/12
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Tue 08/13 2:05 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File. The code has been added to the civil cover sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17). Also be advised that all party names should be entered using ALL CAPS and no punctuation. Clerk will correct party name and origin code. Please also note that this case is not a class action. (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/13 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4587246.), filed by David Haight. (BOWER, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 08/13 1:54 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]