Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Marcia A Crone
Referred: Zack Hawthorn
Case #: 1:19-cv-00352
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2019
Terminated:Dec 09, 2020
Case in other court:60th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Cnty, TX, B-0204036
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2020 3:24 AM CST
Defendant
Target Corporation
Represented By
Elizabeth L Bolt
Littler Mendelson, P.C. - Houston
contact info
Danielle Kujawa Herring
Littler Mendelson, P.C. - Houston
contact info
Plaintiff
Alvin J. Campbell
Represented By
Jeffrey Goldfarb
Goldfarb LLP
contact info
Matthew Paul Harper
Chamblee & Ryan PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
47 47 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/10 3:43 PM
ORDER of dismissal. In accordance with the parties'46 Joint Stipulation of dismissal, filed December 7, 2020, this action is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs of court and attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/9/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
46 46 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/07 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alvin J. Campbell (Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
45 45 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 10/30 10:57 AM
ORDER denying39 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/29/2020. (ttp, )
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Thu 10/29 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2020 re39 Second MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses filed by Alvin J. Campbell. Court to enter an order. Appearances: Keith Koshkin & Mickey Washington, pla cnsl; Elizabeth Bolt, def cnsl. Court Time: 2:32pm - 3:07pm. (Courtroom Deputy & Video Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
44 44 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 10/22 9:03 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing on39 Second MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses : Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/21/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/08 1:39 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re39 Second MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses filed by Alvin J. Campbell . (Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
42 42 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/06 10:02 AM
FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER resetting various deadlines. Final Status Conference set for 6/4/2021 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Order granting41 Joint MOTION to Extend Remaining Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Target Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/5/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/02 5:11 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Remaining Scheduling Order Deadlines by Target Corporation.(Herring, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Fourth Amended Scheduling Order
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
40 40 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/30 4:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re39 Second MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses filed by Target Corporation .(Bolt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Unpublished Opinions,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
39 39 motion Compel Wed 09/16 5:46 PM
Second MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses by Alvin J. Campbell.(Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E
Friday, August 28, 2020
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/28 1:50 PM
NOTICE by Target Corporation Disclosure of Expert Testimony (Bolt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/28 10:45 AM
FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. NOTICE by Target Corporation Designation of Expert Witnesses(Herring, Danielle) Modified on 8/28/2020 (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E
notice Notice of Docket Correction Fri 08/28 12:00 PM
***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #7, Designation of Experts by Target Corporation. This document contains attachments which constitute disclosure/discovery which is not accepted for filing by this Court. Attorney has been instructed to re-file a notice only. (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
36 36 order Protective Order Thu 08/13 12:55 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/13/2020. (ttp, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 08/13 12:13 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part22 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/12/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Protective Order Wed 08/12 3:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Target Corporation.(Bolt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Protective Order
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/12 8:44 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Matthew Paul Harper to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/11/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Thu 08/13 8:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Motion Hearing held on 8/12/2020 re22 First MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses filed by Alvin J. Campbell. Court to enter a written order on the ruling. Appearances: Jeffrey Goldfarb, Mickey Washington, pla cnsl; Danielle Herring, def cnsl. Court Time: 10:52 am - 12;04pm. (Courtroom Deputy & Video Op: Piper, T.) (ttp, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
32 32 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 08/10 2:29 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alvin J. Campbell. (Harper, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
31 31 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 08/07 4:29 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion22 First MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses : Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2020 10:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/7/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
30 30 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/06 8:27 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 8/5/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/27 9:55 PM
NOTICE by Alvin J. Campbell re22 First MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses Joint Notice Regarding Conference on Motion (Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 07/27 2:26 PM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting27 Motion to extend remaining scheduling order deadlines. Final Status Conference reset for 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/27/20. (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
27 27 motion Continue Fri 07/24 11:32 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Extend Remaining Scheduling Order Deadlines by Target Corporation.(Herring, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Third Amended Scheduling Order
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
26 26 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/21 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mickey Lin Washington on behalf of Alvin J. Campbell (Washington, Mickey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
25 25 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/16 10:16 AM
ORDER that lead counsel is ordered to meet and confer on or before Friday, July 24, 2020. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/15/20. (ljw, )
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 07/15 2:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 First MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses filed by Alvin J. Campbell . (Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/09 4:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 First MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses filed by Target Corporation .(Herring, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Letter of June 17,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Target's Email Proposing Phone Conference,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Collected Email Correspondence from Plaintiff's Counsel,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Target's June 24, 2020 Letter to Plaintiff,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Motion to Compel w Time Stamp,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Unpublished Cases,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
22 22 motion Compel Wed 06/24 6:20 PM
First MOTION to Compel Adequate Discovery Responses by Alvin J. Campbell.(Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
21 21 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 05/13 8:42 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER resetting various deadlines. Final Status Conference set for 1/8/2021 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Order granting20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/12/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 05/11 3:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extension of Remaining Scheduling Order Deadlines by Target Corporation.(Herring, Danielle) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/11/2020) (ljw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Remaining Scheduling Order Deadlines
Monday, January 27, 2020
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/28 9:50 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Status Conference set for 11/6/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2020. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/27/2020. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 26, 2020
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Sun 01/26 2:33 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extension of Pretrial Deadlines by Alvin J. Campbell.(Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2019
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 01/02 1:04 PM
ORDER finding as moot13 Motion for Leave to File and his first amended complaint. Plaintiff's14 amended complaint is struck from the record, and Plaintiff's [1-2] original petition is the active pleading. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/30/2019. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/27 3:36 PM
NOTICE by Alvin J. Campbell re14 Amended Complaint,13 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/26 2:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Target Corporation .(Bolt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Adam Klarfeld Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/13 9:54 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation, filed by Alvin J. Campbell.(Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Thu 12/12 5:02 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Alvin J. Campbell.(Goldfarb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint (prop)
Friday, November 01, 2019
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/01 4:06 PM
NOTICE of initial disclosures by Alvin J. Campbell (Goldfarb, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/1/2019 (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Thu 10/31 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Target Corporation Initial Disclosures (Bolt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/31 4:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Status Conference set for 8/7/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/30/2019. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/31 4:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Marcia A. Crone: Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2019. Counsel convened in chambers on Wednesday, October 30, 2019, to inform the court of the facts and issues in this employment discrimination lawsuit. The court and counsel agreed to a scheduling order which will govern all future proceedings (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 09/26 5:26 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Harper, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order
Thursday, August 29, 2019
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/29 1:22 PM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/30/2019 at 10:45 AM at the Beaumont Courthouse in chambers before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. The previous date of 10/4/19 is cancelled.(jc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/22 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/30/2019 at 10:45 AM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (jc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
7 7 5 pgs order Order Fri 08/16 11:07 AM
ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference no later than Thursday, September 12, 2019. Joint written report filed no later than Thursday, September 26, 2019. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 8/15/2019. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/15 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2019 11:00 AM in Beaumont Courthouse in chambers before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (jc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
6 6 cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 3:20 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT B.*** ORIGINAL PETITION against Target Corporation. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/14 2:54 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Target Corporation re1 Notice of Removal(Herring, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Filings and Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Listing of Parties and Status of Removed Case,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - List of Counsel of Record,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Record of Jury Request,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - State Court Address
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 08/14 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L Bolt on behalf of Target Corporation (Bolt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 12:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Herring, Danielle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Jury Demand Wed 08/14 12:06 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (Herring, Danielle)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/14 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 60th District Court of Jefferson County, case number B-0204036. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7392013), filed by All Defendants.(Herring, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings and Civil Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhbit C - Notice to State Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Listing of Parties and Status of Removed Case,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - List of Counsel of Record,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Record of Jury Reques,
Att: 7 Exhibt G - State Court Address
misc Jury Demand Wed 08/14 2:50 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alvin J. Campbell. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/14 2:56 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 08/14 3:21 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (bjc, )
Related: [-]