Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-70556

Illinois Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary P Gorman
Case #: 3:19-ap-07036
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2019
Terminated:Nov 05, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Grane Logistics Express, LLC
2625 Butterfield Road Suite 212E
Oakbrook, IL 60523
Represented By
Grane Logistics Express, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey D Richardson
132 S Water St, Suite 444
Decatur, IL 62523
Represented By
Jeffrey D Richardson
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, December 06, 2021
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 12/07 6:00 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by LS. Receipt Number 80080424. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/05 12:29 PM
Adversary Case 3:19-ap-7036 Closed (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 10/23 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Judgment
Monday, October 21, 2019
11 11 order Judgment Mon 10/21 11:58 AM
Agreed Judgment . (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 10/21 11:59 AM
Disposition of Adversary 3:19-ap-7036 Judgment For Plaintiff Close Adversary: 11/4/2019. (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Fri 10/18 9:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Justin Mertz of Michael Best & Friedrich LLP on behalf of Grane Logistics Express, LLC. (Mertz, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/04 9:50 AM
Amended Complaint by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Jeffrey D Richardson against Grane Logistics Express, LLC Related [+]. (Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-07036 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Jeffrey D Richardson against Grane Logistics Express, LLC Fee Deferred (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Memorandum of Judgment) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey D Richardson
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Memorandum of Judgment
Saturday, August 31, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/31 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Amend
Thursday, August 29, 2019
7 7 order Amend Thu 08/29 10:03 AM
Order Granting Motion To Amend Related [+] (court, emcc)
Related: [-] Related Doc #6
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
6 6 motion Amend Wed 08/28 1:28 PM
Motion to Amend Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Jeffrey D Richardson (Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 First Amended Adversary Complaint
Friday, August 16, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/16 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/14 2:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Grane Logistics Express, LLC 8/14/2019 (Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 crtntc Notice re: Filing of Complaint, Service of Summons and Default (Text Only) Wed 08/14 9:11 AM
(Text-only notice, no associated pdf) NOTICE RE: FILING OF COMPLAINT, SERVICE OF SUMMONS, AND DEFAULT. An adversary complaint has been filed. Selection of the proper "nature of suit" when docketing the complaint is important. Please verify that you have selected all actions that apply to your complaint and no others. For more information about selecting the appropriate "nature of suit" when filing a complaint, see the Court's procedures available on the Court's website or click the link below. A summons has been issued for service on the Defendant(s). The Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint within 7 days of issuance. If not served within 7 days, an alias summons must be requested. It is the sole responsibility of the Plaintiff to determine whether an alias summons is needed. Failure to effectuate proper service within 90 days of the filing of the complaint may result in dismissal. Proof of service is required and should be filed using the "Summons Service Executed" docket event. In the event the Defendant fails to appear and respond to the complaint, the Court will enter a default only upon the filing of a motion for default judgment and satisfaction of all other requirements under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. The Court will no longer request motions for default or default judgment from parties. For more information about the service of summons and complaint and obtaining default judgments, see the Court's procedures for[LINK:Adversary Proceedings: Filing Complaint, Service of Summons, and Motions for Default Judgments] available on the Court's website. (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 08/14 9:11 AM
Summons Issued on Grane Logistics Express, LLC Answer Due 9/13/2019 (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/13 4:59 PM
Adversary case 19-07036 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Jeffrey D Richardson against Grane Logistics Express, LLC Fee Deferred (Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Memorandum of Judgment