New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Referred: Valerie Figueredo
Case #: 1:19-cv-07601
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2019
Terminated:Nov 07, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2020 3:44 AM EST
Defendant
Xinsheng Gu
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Mindy L. Kallus
Mindy Kallus, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Ping Lin
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Mindy L. Kallus
Mindy Kallus, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Shanghai Cafe Deluxe, Inc.
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Mindy L. Kallus
Mindy Kallus, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Shanghai Dumpling, Inc.
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Mindy L. Kallus
Mindy Kallus, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Shanghai Soup Dumpling, Inc.
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Mindy L. Kallus
Mindy Kallus, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Yili Weng
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Mindy L. Kallus
Mindy Kallus, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Su Ping Yu
Represented By
Leanghour Lim
Troy Law PLLC
contact info
John Troy
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info
Aaron B. Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
153 153 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 11/07 3:22 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:152 Opinion & Order. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated November 7, 2023, Judge Figueredo's Report & Recommendation is adopted in full as the opinion of the Court; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 11/7/2023) (nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of right to appeal
152 152 order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 11/07 9:30 AM
OPINION AND ORDER for150 Report and Recommendations. To date, Defendants have not filed objections to the Report nor sought an extension to object. Where no timely objections are made, the Court may adopt the R&R so long as there is no clear error on the face of the record. Sacks v. Gandhi Eng'g, Inc., 999 F.Supp.2d 629, 632 (S.D.N.Y. 2014) (citing Wilds v. United Parcel Serv., 262 F.Supp.2d 163, 169 (S.D.N.Y.2003)). The Court does not find any clear error. Accordingly, for the reasons stated above, Judge Figueredo's Report and Recommendation is adopted in full as the opinion of the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate this case. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/7/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]