Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:W Louis Sands
Case #: 1:19-cv-00139
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2019
Terminated:Nov 16, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2020 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
VERANDA PC
Represented By
LOUIS E HATCHER
contact info
Plaintiff
PENNIE SESBERRY
1712 Lily Pond Road
Albany, GA 31701
Represented By
GREGORY O WIGGINS
contact info
WILLIAM GREG DOBSON
Lober, Dobson & Desai, LLC
contact info
A DANIELLE MCBRIDE
Lober Dobson & Desai LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Monday, November 16, 2020
19 19 order Judgment Mon 11/16 4:43 PM
JUDGMENT of dismissal. (bcl)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/16 4:34 PM
ORDER approving17 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by VERANDA PC. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/16/2020. (bcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/13 2:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by VERANDA PC as to All Defendants (HATCHER, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 04/17 1:56 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be complete by 12/7/2020. Dispositive motions due by 1/4/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 04/17/2020. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 04/10 11:17 AM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by PENNIE SESBERRY filed by GREGORY O WIGGINS.(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Scheduling and Discovery Order
Monday, January 13, 2020
14 14 5 pgs order Order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 01/13 4:31 PM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER re:13 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 01/13/2020. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
13 13 motion Protective Order Fri 01/10 1:46 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order by VERANDA PC filed by LOUIS E HATCHER.(HATCHER, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 16, 2019
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/16 2:34 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice regarding ADR by PENNIE SESBERRY (WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Mon 12/16 11:46 AM
Letter regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution (HATCHER, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
10 10 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Wed 12/11 3:28 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 6/8/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/8/2020. Jury Trial tentatively set for 10/5/2020 at 8:30 AM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/11/2019.(mdm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling & Discovery Order
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 12/10 4:02 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2019. Scheduling and Discovery Order to be entered. Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
9 9 8 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Thu 10/17 2:26 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2019 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 10/17/19. (jbk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/11 2:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE VERANDA PC (HATCHER, LOUIS)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/11 2:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by THE VERANDA PC.(HATCHER, LOUIS)Attorney LOUIS E HATCHER added to party THE VERANDA PC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/30 10:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PENNIE SESBERRY. as to THE VERANDA PC (DOBSON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
5 5 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Thu 08/15 4:03 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by GREGORY O WIGGINS (nop)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/15 3:23 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by PENNIE SESBERRY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3237956, $100(WIGGINS, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Greg Wiggins Certificate of Good Standing
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 08/15 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to THE VERANDA PC. (mdm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent Thu 08/15 3:00 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PENNIE SESBERRY. (mdm)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Complaint Thu 08/15 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT against THE VERANDA PC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3237642, $400 filed by PENNIE SESBERRY(DOBSON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to The Veranda, PC
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Thu 08/15 2:58 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL GREGORY O WIGGINS - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (mdm)
Related: [-]