Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-00060

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Randal S Mashburn
Case #: 3:19-ap-90149
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2019
Terminated:Oct 18, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
JODY KAY MATTENA
PO BOX 597
Westmoreland, TN 37186
Represented By
JODY KAY MATTENA
contact info
Plaintiff
Shellie Biesele
Represented By
Henry E. Hildebrand
Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melodie Jacobsen
Represented By
Henry E. Hildebrand
Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2019
8 8 court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/18 12:55 PM
Adversary Case 3:19-ap-90149 Closed . (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing (Court generated form) Wed 09/25 12:19 PM
Certificate of Mailing for Agreed Order Related [+] (Intake3)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Dischargeability of Debt - SA Order
6 6 order Dischargeability of Debt - SA Order Wed 09/25 11:08 AM
Agreed Order that Debt owed to Shellie Biesele and Melodie Jacobsen is Non-Dischargeable Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 523(a)(2), (a)(4), and (a)(6), the debts which arise from the Final Judgment entered by the Third Judicial District Court for the State of Utah, Salt Lake City County, Case No. 140902798 Signed on 9/25/2019. (slw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
5 5 misc Submitted Order Tue 09/24 9:53 AM
Submitted Agreed Order Declaring Debt Non-Dischargeable Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 523(a)(2), (a)(4), and (a)(6) Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiffs Shellie Biesele, Melodie Jacobsen Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, August 19, 2019
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/19 12:06 PM
Certificate of Service mailed on 8/19/2019 Filed on the behalf of: Plaintiffs Shellie Biesele, Melodie Jacobsen Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, August 16, 2019
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conf Fri 08/16 2:46 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service on JODY KAY MATTENA Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/9/2019 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 1, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Case judge is Randal S Mashburn. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Wed 08/14 4:43 PM
Receipt of Complaint(3:19-ap-90149) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 15696025. Fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 4:42 PM
Adversary case 3:19-ap-90149. Complaint by Shellie Biesele, Melodie Jacobsen against JODY KAY MATTENA. Fee Amount is $350.00. Adversary Fee Will be Paid In Full Electronically at the Time of Filing. Shellie Biesele, Melodie Jacobsen. Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud), 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A, the Verdict Form
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B, the Final Judgment
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C, the Final Appellate Order