HALL et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-03075 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02069 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2020 3:49 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRAVIS HALL
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
WILLIAM HELFRICH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRENNAN LUCAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HUNTER LATSHAW
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DUSTIN LAMB
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON LABUFF
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA KRASOVEC
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KASEY KEELING
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA JERNIGAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DWIGHT JACKSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON HOLDER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT MOORE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACOB GRIBBINS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TODD GOFF
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CODY FRENCH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEREK FENDER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DUSTIN SIZEMOY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DUSTIN WINSTEAD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACK WILLIS, JR.
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JONATHAN WILLIAMS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ONIE WHEELER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY TIMBERS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RYAN SMITH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARCELLOS SMITH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN SMITH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LESTON MITCHELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WADE RUSSELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JONATHAN RONE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATHAN REED
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATHANIEL PICKETT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID PESSALL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL FONTANEZ PATROCINO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GABRIEL DENIGER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CALEB DENNIS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AJAIE ALBERT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADAM ALDERMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERRY ANDREWS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRAVIS ARSENAULT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER ASTUTO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LORANCE BALDWIN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT BARNES
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAYTON BARNETT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID BEBKO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL BERRIOS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES BICE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY BILLINGSLEY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRADLEY BISHOP
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA BLACKMER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY BOND
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JONATHAN BRADLEY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LERONTEZ FANNING
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALLAN DEBOWSKY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADAM COLE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN II COCHRAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM COBB
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SEAN CLANCY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MATTHEW CARVER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT CARD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOE CAPPS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RODNEY BURCH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID BRYANT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RUSTY BROWN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH BROWN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EDWARD BROWN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LANDON BOYD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() CLERK'S DISMISSAL re26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TRAVIS HALL (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 02/09 9:17 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to attorneys of Record. RE: 1/22/2020 Amended Order. An Amended (Short Form) Complaint has not been filed for the remaining first named plaintiff. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
![]() AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Plaintiffs Objections to Pretrial Order No. 18 - Order Governing Initial Census Requirements for Filed Cases by AJAIE ALBERT, ADAM ALDERMAN, JERRY ANDREWS, TRAVIS ARSENAULT, CHRISTOPHER ASTUTO, LORANCE BALDWIN, ROBERT BARNES, PAYTON BARNETT, DAVID BEBKO, MICHAEL BERRIOS, CHARLES BICE, TIMOTHY BILLINGSLEY, BRADLEY BISHOP, JOSHUA BLACKMER, ANTHONY BOND, LANDON BOYD, JONATHAN BRADLEY, EDWARD BROWN, JOSEPH BROWN, RUSTY BROWN, DAVID BRYANT, RODNEY BURCH, JOE CAPPS, ROBERT CARD, MATTHEW CARVER, SEAN CLANCY, WILLIAM COBB, STEPHEN II COCHRAN, ADAM COLE, ALLAN DEBOWSKY, GABRIEL DENIGER, CALEB DENNIS, LERONTEZ FANNING, DEREK FENDER, CODY FRENCH, TODD GOFF, JACOB GRIBBINS, TRAVIS HALL, WILLIAM HELFRICH, JASON HOLDER, DWIGHT JACKSON, JOSHUA JERNIGAN, KASEY KEELING, JOSHUA KRASOVEC, JASON LABUFF, DUSTIN LAMB, HUNTER LATSHAW, BRENNAN LUCAS, LESTON MITCHELL, ROBERT MOORE, MICHAEL FONTANEZ PATROCINO, DAVID PESSALL, NATHANIEL PICKETT, NATHAN REED, JONATHAN RONE, WADE RUSSELL, DUSTIN SIZEMOY, KEVIN SMITH, MARCELLOS SMITH, RYAN SMITH, ANTHONY TIMBERS, ONIE WHEELER, JONATHAN WILLIAMS, JACK WILLIS, JR, DUSTIN WINSTEAD (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 11/12 12:47 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:23 Notice of Plaintiffs Objections to Pretrial Order No. 18 - Order Governing Initial Census Requirements for Filed Cases (djb) |
||
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 10/28 8:14 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:22 Plaintiffs' Objection to21 Pretrial Order No. 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions (djb) |
||
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() RESPONSE by AJAIE ALBERT, ADAM ALDERMAN, JERRY ANDREWS, TRAVIS ARSENAULT, CHRISTOPHER ASTUTO, LORANCE BALDWIN, ROBERT BARNES, PAYTON BARNETT, DAVID BEBKO, MICHAEL BERRIOS, CHARLES BICE, TIMOTHY BILLINGSLEY, BRADLEY BISHOP, JOSHUA BLACKMER, ANTHONY BOND, LANDON BOYD, JONATHAN BRADLEY, EDWARD BROWN, JOSEPH BROWN, RUSTY BROWN, DAVID BRYANT, RODNEY BURCH, JOE CAPPS, ROBERT CARD, MATTHEW CARVER, SEAN CLANCY, WILLIAM COBB, STEPHEN II COCHRAN, ADAM COLE, ALLAN DEBOWSKY, GABRIEL DENIGER, CALEB DENNIS, LERONTEZ FANNING, DEREK FENDER, CODY FRENCH, TODD GOFF, JACOB GRIBBINS, TRAVIS HALL, WILLIAM HELFRICH, JASON HOLDER, DWIGHT JACKSON, JOSHUA JERNIGAN, KASEY KEELING, JOSHUA KRASOVEC, JASON LABUFF, DUSTIN LAMB, HUNTER LATSHAW, BRENNAN LUCAS, LESTON MITCHELL, ROBERT MOORE, MICHAEL FONTANEZ PATROCINO, DAVID PESSALL, NATHANIEL PICKETT, NATHAN REED, JONATHAN RONE, WADE RUSSELL, DUSTIN SIZEMOY, KEVIN SMITH, MARCELLOS SMITH, RYAN SMITH, ANTHONY TIMBERS, ONIE WHEELER, JONATHAN WILLIAMS, JACK WILLIS, JR, DUSTIN WINSTEAD re21 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, Objections to PTO 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions . (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which a remand motion is currently pending, the individual plaintiffs may either: Withdraw the motion to remand within 14 days of the date of this Order, and thereafter be dismissed without prejudice and with the right to file individual complaints in accordance with this Order; or File an objection to this Order, not to exceed two pages, on the docket for their original multi-plaintiff action by October 25, 2019 . Any plaintiffs who object will not be severed until the objection is resolved by the Court. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. It is the parties' responsibility to review and abide by all orders entered in this MDL. All orders on the master docket for the MDL may be accessed through the CM/ECF system and key orders are available on the Court's public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/mdl2885. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Withdraws due by 10/29/2019 .) (djb) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 09/30 7:54 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 MOTION to Remand ,15 Response in Opposition to Motion,17 Sealed Document - X,20 Reply to Response to Motion (djb) |
||
Sunday, September 29, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Remand ,14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by AJAIE ALBERT, ADAM ALDERMAN, JERRY ANDREWS, TRAVIS ARSENAULT, CHRISTOPHER ASTUTO, LORANCE BALDWIN, ROBERT BARNES, PAYTON BARNETT, DAVID BEBKO, MICHAEL BERRIOS, CHARLES BICE, TIMOTHY BILLINGSLEY, BRADLEY BISHOP, JOSHUA BLACKMER, ANTHONY BOND, LANDON BOYD, JONATHAN BRADLEY, EDWARD BROWN, JOSEPH BROWN, RUSTY BROWN, DAVID BRYANT, RODNEY BURCH, JOE CAPPS, ROBERT CARD, MATTHEW CARVER, SEAN CLANCY, WILLIAM COBB, STEPHEN II COCHRAN, ADAM COLE, ALLAN DEBOWSKY, GABRIEL DENIGER, CALEB DENNIS, LERONTEZ FANNING, DEREK FENDER, CODY FRENCH, TODD GOFF, JACOB GRIBBINS, TRAVIS HALL, WILLIAM HELFRICH, JASON HOLDER, DWIGHT JACKSON, JOSHUA JERNIGAN, KASEY KEELING, JOSHUA KRASOVEC, JASON LABUFF, DUSTIN LAMB, HUNTER LATSHAW, BRENNAN LUCAS, LESTON MITCHELL, ROBERT MOORE, MICHAEL FONTANEZ PATROCINO, DAVID PESSALL, NATHANIEL PICKETT, NATHAN REED, JONATHAN RONE, WADE RUSSELL, DUSTIN SIZEMOY, KEVIN SMITH, MARCELLOS SMITH, RYAN SMITH, ANTHONY TIMBERS, ONIE WHEELER, JONATHAN WILLIAMS, JACK WILLIS, JR, DUSTIN WINSTEAD. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Reply memoranda are due by September 30, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/23/2019. (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 09/23 7:50 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support, re13 MOTION to Remand ,17 Sealed Document - X,15 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb) |
||
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for Leave to File re13 MOTION to Remand ,17 Sealed Document - X,15 Response in Opposition to Motion, Reply Memorandum in Support by AJAIE ALBERT, ADAM ALDERMAN, JERRY ANDREWS, TRAVIS ARSENAULT, CHRISTOPHER ASTUTO, LORANCE BALDWIN, ROBERT BARNES, PAYTON BARNETT, DAVID BEBKO, MICHAEL BERRIOS, CHARLES BICE, TIMOTHY BILLINGSLEY, BRADLEY BISHOP, JOSHUA BLACKMER, ANTHONY BOND, LANDON BOYD, JONATHAN BRADLEY, EDWARD BROWN, JOSEPH BROWN, RUSTY BROWN, DAVID BRYANT, RODNEY BURCH, JOE CAPPS, ROBERT CARD, MATTHEW CARVER, SEAN CLANCY, WILLIAM COBB, STEPHEN II COCHRAN, ADAM COLE, ALLAN DEBOWSKY, GABRIEL DENIGER, CALEB DENNIS, LERONTEZ FANNING, DEREK FENDER, CODY FRENCH, TODD GOFF, JACOB GRIBBINS, TRAVIS HALL, WILLIAM HELFRICH, JASON HOLDER, DWIGHT JACKSON, JOSHUA JERNIGAN, KASEY KEELING, JOSHUA KRASOVEC, JASON LABUFF, DUSTIN LAMB, HUNTER LATSHAW, BRENNAN LUCAS, LESTON MITCHELL, ROBERT MOORE, MICHAEL FONTANEZ PATROCINO, DAVID PESSALL, NATHANIEL PICKETT, NATHAN REED, JONATHAN RONE, WADE RUSSELL, DUSTIN SIZEMOY, KEVIN SMITH, MARCELLOS SMITH, RYAN SMITH, ANTHONY TIMBERS, ONIE WHEELER, JONATHAN WILLIAMS, JACK WILLIS, JR, DUSTIN WINSTEAD. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Sealed Response. (sdw) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER. These matters are before the Court on Defendants' motions for leave to file under seal their responses to the motions to remand pending in the above- referenced cases. For good cause shown, Defendants' motions are GRANTED, as requested. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/12/2019. (sdw) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 09/12 8:33 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 MOTION to Remand ,14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand ,15 Response in Opposition to Motion (MB) |
||
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Remand [PUBLIC VERSION] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Remand by AJAIE ALBERT, ADAM ALDERMAN, JERRY ANDREWS, TRAVIS ARSENAULT, CHRISTOPHER ASTUTO, LORANCE BALDWIN, ROBERT BARNES, PAYTON BARNETT, DAVID BEBKO, MICHAEL BERRIOS, CHARLES BICE, TIMOTHY BILLINGSLEY, BRADLEY BISHOP, JOSHUA BLACKMER, ANTHONY BOND, LANDON BOYD, JONATHAN BRADLEY, EDWARD BROWN, JOSEPH BROWN, RUSTY BROWN, DAVID BRYANT, RODNEY BURCH, JOE CAPPS, ROBERT CARD, MATTHEW CARVER, SEAN CLANCY, WILLIAM COBB, STEPHEN II COCHRAN, ADAM COLE, ALLAN DEBOWSKY, GABRIEL DENIGER, CALEB DENNIS, LERONTEZ FANNING, DEREK FENDER, CODY FRENCH, TODD GOFF, JACOB GRIBBINS, TRAVIS HALL, WILLIAM HELFRICH, JASON HOLDER, DWIGHT JACKSON, JOSHUA JERNIGAN, KASEY KEELING, JOSHUA KRASOVEC, JASON LABUFF, DUSTIN LAMB, HUNTER LATSHAW, BRENNAN LUCAS, LESTON MITCHELL, ROBERT MOORE, MICHAEL FONTANEZ PATROCINO, DAVID PESSALL, NATHANIEL PICKETT, NATHAN REED, JONATHAN RONE, WADE RUSSELL, DUSTIN SIZEMOY, KEVIN SMITH, MARCELLOS SMITH, RYAN SMITH, ANTHONY TIMBERS, ONIE WHEELER, JONATHAN WILLIAMS, JACK WILLIS, JR, DUSTIN WINSTEAD. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/28 1:49 PM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/11/2019) . (djb) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION to all counsel of record who are not admitted to the FLND. re10 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02069. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
9 | 9
![]() CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2069 (JRT-BRT). (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |