Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Marcia G Cooke
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:19-cv-23446
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:0499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2019
Terminated:Sep 16, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2020 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Ship Supply of Florida, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324
Defendant
Christian Giannakopoulos
Defendant
Adam Kaplan
Defendant
Ares Michaelides
Defendant
Parashar Ranade
Defendant
Rick Rosen
Defendant
Jeff Zanarini
Plaintiff
Agri Exotic Trading, Inc.
Represented By
Marc Philip Barmat
Furr & Cohen
contact info
Plaintiff
Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC.
Represented By
Marc Philip Barmat
Furr & Cohen
contact info
Plaintiff
Produce Alliance, LLC.
Represented By
Marc Philip Barmat
Furr & Cohen
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Monday, September 16, 2019
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/16 3:13 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
14 14 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 08/30 2:55 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER canceling hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 2:30 PM on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction, in light of Plaintiffs'13 notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/30/2019. (km03)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 08/29 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Agri Exotic Trading, Inc., Coastal Sunbelt Produce, LLC., Produce Alliance, LLC. (Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
12 12 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Tue 08/27 3:36 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs'4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for 9/5/2019 at 02:30 PM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (km03)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
11 11 order Order Referring Motion Fri 08/23 11:10 AM
ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING4 &5 MOTIONS. Plaintiffs'4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are hereby referred to the Honorable Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/23/2019. (smz)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
10 10 15 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 08/19 3:10 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
9 9 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 08/16 3:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Robert Feldgreber filed by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC., COASTAL SUNBELT PRODUCE, LLC, PRODUCE ALLIANCE, LLC.(Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3
8 8 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 08/16 3:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Shawna Cassady filed by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC., COASTAL SUNBELT PRODUCE, LLC, PRODUCE ALLIANCE, LLC.(Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5
7 7 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 08/16 3:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC., COASTAL SUNBELT PRODUCE, LLC, PRODUCE ALLIANCE, LLC.(Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5
6 6 8 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 08/16 3:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC., COASTAL SUNBELT PRODUCE, LLC, PRODUCE ALLIANCE, LLC. (Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 08/16 2:41 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC., COASTAL SUNBELT PRODUCE, LLC, PRODUCE ALLIANCE, LLC. (Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 08/16 2:39 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC., COASTAL SUNBELT PRODUCE, LLC, PRODUCE ALLIANCE, LLC. Responses due by 8/30/2019 (Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/16 2:36 PM
Summons Issued as to CHRISTIAN GIANNAKOPOULOS, ADAM KAPLAN, ARES MICHAELIDES, PARASHAR RANADE, RICK ROSEN, Ship Supply of Florida, Inc., JEFF ZANARINI. (pcs)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 08/16 2:28 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/16 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11909007, filed by PRODUCE ALLIANCE, LLC, COASTAL SUNBELT PRODUCE, LLC, AGRI EXOTIC TRADING, INC..(Barmat, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) SHIP SUPPLY OF FLORIDA, INC. t/a SHIP SUPPLY INTERNATIONAL, a/t/a SSF SHIP SUPPLY OF FLORIDA, INC.,,
Att: 3 Summon(s) ARES MICHAELIDES,
Att: 4 Summon(s) CHRISTIAN GIANNAKOPOULOS,
Att: 5 Summon(s) ADAM KAPLAN,
Att: 6 Summon(s) JEFF ZANARINI,
Att: 7 Summon(s) PARASHAR RANADE,
Att: 8 Summon(s) RICK ROSEN