Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:19-cv-62078
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2019
Terminated:Apr 29, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2020 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Vohra Health Services, P.A.
Represented By
Kevin P. Gildea
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Joshua Lee Spoont
Sodhi Spoont PLLC
contact info
Eric Matthew Sodhi
Sodhi Spoont PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Glenn J Waldman
Waldman Trigoboff 100 N.E. Third Avenue Suite 780
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Plaintiff
Wound Care Concepts, Inc.
Represented By
Marisa Rosen Dorough
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkiwitz PC
contact info
Hal Kemp Litchford
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info
Marisa Elizabeth Rosen
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkiwitz PC
contact info
Stephen M. Azia
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info
Kristine L. Roberts
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
422 422 respm Response to Motion Wed 07/13 11:09 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re421 MOTION to Vacate Defendants/Counter-Claim Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Vacate or Withdraw Summary Judgment Orders filed by GENTELL, INC., Wound Care Concepts, Inc.. Replies due by 7/20/2022. (Litchford, Hal)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
421 421 motion Vacate Mon 07/11 3:17 PM
MOTION to Vacate Defendants/Counter-Claim Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Vacate or Withdraw Summary Judgment Orders by Vohra Health Services, P.A.. Responses due by 7/25/2022 (Arango, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]