Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03177
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2020 4:40 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER GARCIA
Represented By
DENNIS CRAIG REICH
Reich & Binstock Llp - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/25 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA HENRY BAUER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER GARCIA (BAUER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 8:48 AM
MASTER SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CHRISTOPHER GARCIA. (REICH, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/13 8:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER GARCIA. AEARO HOLDING LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; AEARO LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (REICH, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/13 8:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER GARCIA. 3M COMPANY served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (REICH, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 08/21 8:42 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, #1 Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo LLC and Aearo Technologies, LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 08/20 10:45 AM
NOTICE As to Filing Proposed Summons to Aearo Technologies LLC et al. by CHRISTOPHER GARCIA (REICH, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 08/20 10:44 AM
NOTICE As to Filing Proposed Summons to 3M Company, et al. by CHRISTOPHER GARCIA (REICH, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/20 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4594182.), filed by CHRISTOPHER GARCIA. (REICH, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/21 7:25 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]