CLAYBROOK et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-03183 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02144 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2020 3:52 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL CLAYBROOK
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
BRYAN SCHULTZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT MOYA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LANORMA MURDOCK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHNNIE MURRIEL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADAM NAUJOKAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TYRONE NEARS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN OLIVER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MOSES PILLA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES RATLIFF
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CYRILL RITCHIE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERICK VEGA ROSARIO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADEM SAID
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARCHIE SANDERS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RANDAL MORRIS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY SHASTAY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRADLEY SPRATT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHIL STUKENHOLTZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRODIE TOZIER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LUCAS TUCKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMAR VALENTINE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EDWIN VELEZ-VIGO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LORENZO WALTERS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARLON WILDER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JIM WILSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK WINKELMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRANDON MOSS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARTHUR AMOS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERIC BAKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHILLIP BAYS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SPENCER BIAH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEE BRADDOCK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRYAN BROOKS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRYCE COFFMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES CROW
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DALE DAVIS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL GATONS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOUGLAS GREEN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN GUYNES
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DUSTIN HARPER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MATTHEW HELGESON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRAVIS HOLCOMB
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CODY JACKSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GREGORY LOCKETT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAMUEL MADISON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONALD MCGEE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HAROLD MCMILLIAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL MORIN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRIS MOUNTJOY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
![]() First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by DANIEL CLAYBROOK. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 02/09 10:10 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to attorneys of Record. RE: 1/22/2020 Amended Order. An Amended (Short Form) Complaint has not been filed for the remaining first named plaintiff. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
![]() AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Plaintiffs Objections to Pretrial Order No. 18 - Order Governing Initial Census Requirements for Filed Cases by ARTHUR AMOS, ERIC BAKER, PHILLIP BAYS, SPENCER BIAH, LEE BRADDOCK, BRYAN BROOKS, DANIEL CLAYBROOK, BRYCE COFFMAN, JAMES CROW, DALE DAVIS, PAUL GATONS, DOUGLAS GREEN, STEPHEN GUYNES, DUSTIN HARPER, MATTHEW HELGESON, TRAVIS HOLCOMB, CODY JACKSON, GREGORY LOCKETT, SAMUEL MADISON, DONALD MCGEE, HAROLD MCMILLIAN, DANIEL MORIN, RANDAL MORRIS, BRANDON MOSS, CHRIS MOUNTJOY, ROBERT MOYA, LANORMA MURDOCK, JOHNNIE MURRIEL, ADAM NAUJOKAS, TYRONE NEARS, BRIAN OLIVER, MOSES PILLA, CHARLES RATLIFF, CYRILL RITCHIE, ERICK VEGA ROSARIO, ADEM SAID, ARCHIE SANDERS, BRYAN SCHULTZ, ANTHONY SHASTAY, BRADLEY SPRATT, PHIL STUKENHOLTZ, BRODIE TOZIER, LUCAS TUCKER, AMAR VALENTINE, EDWIN VELEZ-VIGO, LORENZO WALTERS, ARLON WILDER, JIM WILSON, MARK WINKELMAN (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 11/12 1:13 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:21 Notice of Plaintiffs Objections to Pretrial Order No. 18 - Order Governing Initial Census Requirements for Filed Cases (djb) |
||
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 10/28 8:54 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:20 Plaintiffs' Objections to19 Pretrial Order No. 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions (djb) |
||
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE by ARTHUR AMOS, ERIC BAKER, PHILLIP BAYS, SPENCER BIAH, LEE BRADDOCK, BRYAN BROOKS, DANIEL CLAYBROOK, BRYCE COFFMAN, JAMES CROW, DALE DAVIS, PAUL GATONS, DOUGLAS GREEN, STEPHEN GUYNES, DUSTIN HARPER, MATTHEW HELGESON, TRAVIS HOLCOMB, CODY JACKSON, GREGORY LOCKETT, SAMUEL MADISON, DONALD MCGEE, HAROLD MCMILLIAN, DANIEL MORIN, RANDAL MORRIS, BRANDON MOSS, CHRIS MOUNTJOY, ROBERT MOYA, LANORMA MURDOCK, JOHNNIE MURRIEL, ADAM NAUJOKAS, TYRONE NEARS, BRIAN OLIVER, MOSES PILLA, CHARLES RATLIFF, CYRILL RITCHIE, ERICK VEGA ROSARIO, ADEM SAID, ARCHIE SANDERS, BRYAN SCHULTZ, ANTHONY SHASTAY, BRADLEY SPRATT, PHIL STUKENHOLTZ, BRODIE TOZIER, LUCAS TUCKER, AMAR VALENTINE, EDWIN VELEZ-VIGO, LORENZO WALTERS, ARLON WILDER, JIM WILSON, MARK WINKELMAN re19 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, Objections to PTO 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions . (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which a remand motion is currently pending, the individual plaintiffs may either: Withdraw the motion to remand within 14 days of the date of this Order, and thereafter be dismissed without prejudice and with the right to file individual complaints in accordance with this Order; or File an objection to this Order, not to exceed two pages, on the docket for their original multi-plaintiff action by October 25, 2019 . Any plaintiffs who object will not be severed until the objection is resolved by the Court. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. It is the parties' responsibility to review and abide by all orders entered in this MDL. All orders on the master docket for the MDL may be accessed through the CM/ECF system and key orders are available on the Court's public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/mdl2885. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Withdraws due by 10/29/2019 .) (djb) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 09/30 8:42 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:12 MOTION to Remand ,14 Response in Opposition to Motion,18 Reply to Response to Motion (djb) |
||
Sunday, September 29, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Remand ,13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by ARTHUR AMOS, ERIC BAKER, PHILLIP BAYS, SPENCER BIAH, LEE BRADDOCK, BRYAN BROOKS, DANIEL CLAYBROOK, BRYCE COFFMAN, JAMES CROW, DALE DAVIS, PAUL GATONS, DOUGLAS GREEN, STEPHEN GUYNES, DUSTIN HARPER, MATTHEW HELGESON, TRAVIS HOLCOMB, CODY JACKSON, GREGORY LOCKETT, SAMUEL MADISON, DONALD MCGEE, HAROLD MCMILLIAN, DANIEL MORIN, RANDAL MORRIS, BRANDON MOSS, CHRIS MOUNTJOY, ROBERT MOYA, LANORMA MURDOCK, JOHNNIE MURRIEL, ADAM NAUJOKAS, TYRONE NEARS, BRIAN OLIVER, MOSES PILLA, CHARLES RATLIFF, CYRILL RITCHIE, ERICK VEGA ROSARIO, ADEM SAID, ARCHIE SANDERS, BRYAN SCHULTZ, ANTHONY SHASTAY, BRADLEY SPRATT, PHIL STUKENHOLTZ, BRODIE TOZIER, LUCAS TUCKER, AMAR VALENTINE, EDWIN VELEZ-VIGO, LORENZO WALTERS, ARLON WILDER, JIM WILSON, MARK WINKELMAN. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Reply memoranda are due by September 30, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/23/2019. (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 09/23 8:19 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support, re14 Response in Opposition to Motion,12 MOTION to Remand (djb) |
||
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Leave to File re14 Response in Opposition to Motion,12 MOTION to Remand Reply Memorandum in Support by ARTHUR AMOS, ERIC BAKER, PHILLIP BAYS, SPENCER BIAH, LEE BRADDOCK, BRYAN BROOKS, DANIEL CLAYBROOK, BRYCE COFFMAN, JAMES CROW, DALE DAVIS, PAUL GATONS, DOUGLAS GREEN, STEPHEN GUYNES, DUSTIN HARPER, MATTHEW HELGESON, TRAVIS HOLCOMB, CODY JACKSON, GREGORY LOCKETT, SAMUEL MADISON, DONALD MCGEE, HAROLD MCMILLIAN, DANIEL MORIN, RANDAL MORRIS, BRANDON MOSS, CHRIS MOUNTJOY, ROBERT MOYA, LANORMA MURDOCK, JOHNNIE MURRIEL, ADAM NAUJOKAS, TYRONE NEARS, BRIAN OLIVER, MOSES PILLA, CHARLES RATLIFF, CYRILL RITCHIE, ERICK VEGA ROSARIO, ADEM SAID, ARCHIE SANDERS, BRYAN SCHULTZ, ANTHONY SHASTAY, BRADLEY SPRATT, PHIL STUKENHOLTZ, BRODIE TOZIER, LUCAS TUCKER, AMAR VALENTINE, EDWIN VELEZ-VIGO, LORENZO WALTERS, ARLON WILDER, JIM WILSON, MARK WINKELMAN. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 09/18 7:25 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:12 MOTION to Remand ,14 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb) |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER granting 13 Motion to Seal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/17/2019. (djb) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Remand [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to Remand by ARTHUR AMOS, ERIC BAKER, PHILLIP BAYS, SPENCER BIAH, LEE BRADDOCK, BRYAN BROOKS, DANIEL CLAYBROOK, BRYCE COFFMAN, JAMES CROW, DALE DAVIS, PAUL GATONS, DOUGLAS GREEN, STEPHEN GUYNES, DUSTIN HARPER, MATTHEW HELGESON, TRAVIS HOLCOMB, CODY JACKSON, GREGORY LOCKETT, SAMUEL MADISON, DONALD MCGEE, HAROLD MCMILLIAN, DANIEL MORIN, RANDAL MORRIS, BRANDON MOSS, CHRIS MOUNTJOY, ROBERT MOYA, LANORMA MURDOCK, JOHNNIE MURRIEL, ADAM NAUJOKAS, TYRONE NEARS, BRIAN OLIVER, MOSES PILLA, CHARLES RATLIFF, CYRILL RITCHIE, ERICK VEGA ROSARIO, ADEM SAID, ARCHIE SANDERS, BRYAN SCHULTZ, ANTHONY SHASTAY, BRADLEY SPRATT, PHIL STUKENHOLTZ, BRODIE TOZIER, LUCAS TUCKER, AMAR VALENTINE, EDWIN VELEZ-VIGO, LORENZO WALTERS, ARLON WILDER, JIM WILSON, MARK WINKELMAN. (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/04 8:27 AM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/17/2019) . (djb) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (djb) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2144 (DWF/LIB). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |