ALEXANDER v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-03193 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02174 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2020 4:28 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
ANDRE ALEXANDER
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
CHARLES MILLER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES MARBURY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MILLER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM MINK
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW G. MODICA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN MONROE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY SCOTT MOORE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID J. MURCKO
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAMUEL MURRAY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KYLE M. NELSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GREGORY MCREYNOLDS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES P. MCCOOL
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATRICK MCCLURE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DARRYL PINTO
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEFFREY MALONE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEREK LOVE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KIZZY LOUIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TYRONE LEARY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHELLE JONES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARTHUR SCHAREIN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVE BENEFIELD
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
|
Plaintiff
RODERICK WOODS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK WILLIAMS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EVAN RAHEEM WILLIAMS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL THORIN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CURTIS THOMAS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY SONNIER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT SIMPSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY L. SHOEMAKER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALBERT NEW, III
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS ROBERTS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASHLEY RIVERA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD RIFFLE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTNY W. REGAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONNIE RALEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIARD PIPPIN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MATTHEW S. JOHNSTON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA PHILLIPS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEONARD OSBRON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDRAE BROWN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES DESANTIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSE LEE DEROUEN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRANDON DAVIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT C. CUTAJAR
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RACHEL T. CURRIE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEFFREY SCOTT COLYER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALTON CHESNE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHILIP CALLIGAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAY CAIN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MELVIN S. BROWN, JR.
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON HUNLEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM BLACK
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN BEST
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY BEHRNS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TOBY BAYNE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUSTIN BATES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH TODD BARTON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAYMOND E. BARNETT, JR.
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KYLE D. AMBURGEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY EDWARDS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MATTHEW L. JONES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PETER HOUTMAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DORIS B. HOLT
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT HOLLEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LATONIA DENISE HOLLAND
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON JEVON HODGEN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY HILLARD, JR
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATRICK HENDRY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROSHAUN HAWKINS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAJOR L. HARRIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRANK HALL
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL G. GUIENT, SR.
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES E. GRIFFITH, JR.
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA PAUL GRANGER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA GOWER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL GOOSEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL J. GILLIAM
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMOS FINCH
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TYLER B. ECKENROD
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Remand by ANDRE ALEXANDER. (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/05 7:30 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/18/2019) . (djb) |
||
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ANDRE ALEXANDER. (PAUL, RICHARD) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. JOSEPH TODD BARTON, JUSTIN BATES, TOBY BAYNE, JEREMY BEHRNS, STEVEN BENEFIELD, BRIAN BEST, WILLIAM BLACK, ANDRAE BROWN, MELVIN S. BROWN, JR, JAY CAIN, PHILIP CALLIGAN, ALTON CHESNE, JEFFREY SCOTT COLYER, RACHEL T. CURRIE, ROBERT C. CUTAJAR, BRANDON DAVIS, JESSE LEE DEROUEN, CHARLES DESANTIS, TYLER B. ECKENROD, ANTHONY EDWARDS, AMOS FINCH, MICHAEL J. GILLIAM, MICHAEL GOOSEY, JOSHUA GOWER, JOSHUA PAUL GRANGER, JAMES E. GRIFFITH, JR, DANIEL G. GUIENT, SR, FRANK HALL, MAJOR L. HARRIS, ROSHAUN HAWKINS, PATRICK HENDRY, ANTHONY HILLARD, JR, JASON JEVON HODGEN, LATONIA DENISE HOLLAND, ROBERT HOLLEY, DORIS B. HOLT, PETER HOUTMAN, JASON HUNLEY, MATTHEW S. JOHNSTON, MATTHEW L. JONES, MICHELLE JONES, TYRONE LEARY, KIZZY LOUIS, DEREK LOVE, JEFFREY MALONE, JAMES MARBURY, PATRICK MCCLURE, JAMES P. MCCOOL, GREGORY MCREYNOLDS, CHARLES MILLER, MICHAEL MILLER, WILLIAM MINK, ANDREW G. MODICA, BRIAN MONROE, TIMOTHY SCOTT MOORE, DAVID J. MURCKO, SAMUEL MURRAY, KYLE M. NELSON, ALBERT NEW, III, LEONARD OSBRON, JOSHUA PHILLIPS, DARRYL PINTO, WILLIARD PIPPIN, RONNIE RALEY, TIMOTNY W. REGAN, RICHARD RIFFLE, ASHLEY RIVERA, THOMAS ROBERTS, ARTHUR SCHAREIN, JEREMY L. SHOEMAKER, ROBERT SIMPSON, JEREMY SONNIER, CURTIS THOMAS, MICHAEL THORIN, EVAN RAHEEM WILLIAMS, MARK WILLIAMS, RODERICK WOODS, KYLE D. AMBURGEY and RAYMOND E. BARNETT, JR terminated. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02174. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwartz Sean Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2174 (WMW/DTS). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |