Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03194
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02188
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2020 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
DAVID BRYANT
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
JUSTIN BUCHMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANE BUCK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARTIN BUCKNER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY RONALD BUCKNER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TONY MONDALE BUFFORD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS BUNGERT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RAYMOND BUNN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC MAURICE BURDETT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER BURDETTE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE ANNE BURDSALL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ADRIAN BURGESS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
AIMEE M. BURKE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRIS BURKE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RONALD ERIC BURKHARDT, JR.
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH WAYNE BURLINGHAM
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GORDON R. BURNEY, II
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT LEE BURNS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSE BURRELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN BURTSFIELD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN TROY BUSSEY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL ARTHUR BUTLER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN CABRAL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAYNE CALLABY, JR.
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN CALLOWAY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEREK JAMES CAMERON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRANDON CAMP
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY CAMPBELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN EDWARD CAMPBELL, JR.
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH CAMPBELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY CANCEL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRADLEY WADE CARAVIELLO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL CARDENAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON CARNES
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TRAVIS RANDALL CARPENTER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK THOMAS CARROLL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RONALD CARTER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM BRADLY CARTER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ZACHARY CASADA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH CASANOVA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ETHAN OREN CASE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GABRIEL CASILLAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DONNIE CASON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER CATT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRANDON CENTRA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE CERRATO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM CHAMBERLAIN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DARREN CHAPMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DON CHAPMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TERRY CHAPMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEMARIS CHAVIS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID CHESSER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL CHILDERS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID WEBSTER CHILDRESS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTONINO CHIOVARI
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES DOUGLAS CHITTENDEN, JR.
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANE ANTHONY CHRISS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSH CHRISTMON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT M. CHUBB
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL CHYTERBOK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
HERBERT CLARK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LARRY CLARK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ETHAN CLARKE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT CLEMENTS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN LEE CLIBURN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GARRISON COBB
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM COCHRAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VERONICA A. COFFEE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT COHEN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MYLES COLBETH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RON COLEMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN COLEMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KEITH COLLINS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GENARO COLON-VELEZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL LAURANCE CONANT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NATHALIE CONLEY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVE CONNELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TERRY CONNER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ZEDRICK CONNER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRIS CONWAY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH COOK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISTOPHER LEE COOK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PHILLIP COOK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK FITZGERALD COOPER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TERRANCE COOPER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WOODROW COOPER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALAN COPE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN CORDRAY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG CORLEY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
OTIS CORLEY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CAMERON CORSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT CORTES
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOE COSTANZO
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TED COTTON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT COUSER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GERMAN COELLO MARTINEZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, March 09, 2020
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/09 2:17 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DAVID BRYANT. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
23 23 17 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 9:33 AM
AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 10/28 9:03 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:22 Plaintiffs' Objections to20 Pretrial Order No. 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
22 22 respoth Response/Reply Fri 10/25 9:11 PM
RESPONSE by DAVID BRYANT, JUSTIN BUCHMAN, SHANE BUCK, MARTIN BUCKNER, TIMOTHY RONALD BUCKNER, TONY MONDALE BUFFORD, THOMAS BUNGERT, RAYMOND BUNN, ERIC MAURICE BURDETT, CHRISTOPHER BURDETTE, JACQUELINE ANNE BURDSALL, ADRIAN BURGESS, AIMEE M. BURKE, CHRIS BURKE, RONALD ERIC BURKHARDT, JR, KENNETH WAYNE BURLINGHAM, GORDON R. BURNEY, II, ROBERT LEE BURNS, JESSE BURRELL, BRIAN BURTSFIELD, BRIAN TROY BUSSEY, DANIEL ARTHUR BUTLER, JONATHAN CABRAL, DAYNE CALLABY, JR, BRIAN CALLOWAY, DEREK JAMES CAMERON, BRANDON CAMP, JEFFREY CAMPBELL, JOHN EDWARD CAMPBELL, JR, KENNETH CAMPBELL, JEFFREY CANCEL, BRADLEY WADE CARAVIELLO, DANIEL CARDENAS, JASON CARNES, TRAVIS RANDALL CARPENTER, PATRICK THOMAS CARROLL, RONALD CARTER, WILLIAM BRADLY CARTER, ZACHARY CASADA, JOSEPH CASANOVA, ETHAN OREN CASE, GABRIEL CASILLAS, DONNIE CASON, CHRISTOPHER CATT, BRANDON CENTRA, JOSE CERRATO, WILLIAM CHAMBERLAIN, DARREN CHAPMAN, DON CHAPMAN, TERRY CHAPMAN, DEMARIS CHAVIS, DAVID CHESSER, DANIEL CHILDERS, DAVID WEBSTER CHILDRESS, ANTONINO CHIOVARI, JAMES DOUGLAS CHITTENDEN, JR, SHANE ANTHONY CHRISS, JOSH CHRISTMON, ROBERT M. CHUBB, MICHAEL CHYTERBOK, HERBERT CLARK, LARRY CLARK, ETHAN CLARKE, ROBERT CLEMENTS, BRIAN LEE CLIBURN, GARRISON COBB, WILLIAM COCHRAN, VERONICA A. COFFEE, ROBERT COHEN, MYLES COLBETH, RON COLEMAN, STEVEN COLEMAN, KEITH COLLINS, GENARO COLON-VELEZ, MICHAEL LAURANCE CONANT, NATHALIE CONLEY, STEVE CONNELL, TERRY CONNER, ZEDRICK CONNER, CHRIS CONWAY, JOSEPH COOK, KRISTOPHER LEE COOK, PHILLIP COOK, PATRICK FITZGERALD COOPER, TERRANCE COOPER, WOODROW COOPER, ALAN COPE, KEVIN CORDRAY, CRAIG CORLEY, OTIS CORLEY, CAMERON CORSON, ROBERT CORTES, JOE COSTANZO, TED COTTON, ROBERT COUSER, GERMAN COELLO MARTINEZ re20 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, . (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, October 18, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 10/18 7:14 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:21 Reply to Response to Motion,14 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,16 Response in Opposition to Motion, (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/17 6:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID BRYANT, JUSTIN BUCHMAN, SHANE BUCK, MARTIN BUCKNER, TIMOTHY RONALD BUCKNER, TONY MONDALE BUFFORD, THOMAS BUNGERT, RAYMOND BUNN, ERIC MAURICE BURDETT, CHRISTOPHER BURDETTE, JACQUELINE ANNE BURDSALL, ADRIAN BURGESS, AIMEE M. BURKE, CHRIS BURKE, RONALD ERIC BURKHARDT, JR, KENNETH WAYNE BURLINGHAM, GORDON R. BURNEY, II, ROBERT LEE BURNS, JESSE BURRELL, BRIAN BURTSFIELD, BRIAN TROY BUSSEY, DANIEL ARTHUR BUTLER, JONATHAN CABRAL, DAYNE CALLABY, JR, BRIAN CALLOWAY, DEREK JAMES CAMERON, BRANDON CAMP, JEFFREY CAMPBELL, JOHN EDWARD CAMPBELL, JR, KENNETH CAMPBELL, JEFFREY CANCEL, BRADLEY WADE CARAVIELLO, DANIEL CARDENAS, JASON CARNES, TRAVIS RANDALL CARPENTER, PATRICK THOMAS CARROLL, RONALD CARTER, WILLIAM BRADLY CARTER, ZACHARY CASADA, JOSEPH CASANOVA, ETHAN OREN CASE, GABRIEL CASILLAS, DONNIE CASON, CHRISTOPHER CATT, BRANDON CENTRA, JOSE CERRATO, WILLIAM CHAMBERLAIN, DARREN CHAPMAN, DON CHAPMAN, TERRY CHAPMAN, DEMARIS CHAVIS, DAVID CHESSER, DANIEL CHILDERS, DAVID WEBSTER CHILDRESS, ANTONINO CHIOVARI, JAMES DOUGLAS CHITTENDEN, JR, SHANE ANTHONY CHRISS, JOSH CHRISTMON, ROBERT M. CHUBB, MICHAEL CHYTERBOK, HERBERT CLARK, LARRY CLARK, ETHAN CLARKE, ROBERT CLEMENTS, BRIAN LEE CLIBURN, GARRISON COBB, WILLIAM COCHRAN, VERONICA A. COFFEE, ROBERT COHEN, MYLES COLBETH, RON COLEMAN, STEVEN COLEMAN, KEITH COLLINS, GENARO COLON-VELEZ, MICHAEL LAURANCE CONANT, NATHALIE CONLEY, STEVE CONNELL, TERRY CONNER, ZEDRICK CONNER, CHRIS CONWAY, JOSEPH COOK, KRISTOPHER LEE COOK, PHILLIP COOK, PATRICK FITZGERALD COOPER, TERRANCE COOPER, WOODROW COOPER, ALAN COPE, KEVIN CORDRAY, CRAIG CORLEY, OTIS CORLEY, CAMERON CORSON, ROBERT CORTES, JOE COSTANZO, TED COTTON, ROBERT COUSER, GERMAN COELLO MARTINEZ. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
20 20 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 10/16 12:54 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which a remand motion is currently pending, the individual plaintiffs may either: Withdraw the motion to remand within 14 days of the date of this Order, and thereafter be dismissed without prejudice and with the right to file individual complaints in accordance with this Order; or File an objection to this Order, not to exceed two pages, on the docket for their original multi-plaintiff action by October 25, 2019 . Any plaintiffs who object will not be severed until the objection is resolved by the Court. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. It is the parties' responsibility to review and abide by all orders entered in this MDL. All orders on the master docket for the MDL may be accessed through the CM/ECF system and key orders are available on the Court's public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/mdl2885. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Withdraws due by 10/29/2019 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
19 19 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/10 11:00 AM
ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply re 16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand. ( Reply due by 10/17/2019 .). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 10/09 8:20 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand re16 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
18 18 motion Leave to File Document Tue 10/08 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File re16 Response in Opposition to Motion, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND by DAVID BRYANT, JUSTIN BUCHMAN, SHANE BUCK, MARTIN BUCKNER, TIMOTHY RONALD BUCKNER, TONY MONDALE BUFFORD, THOMAS BUNGERT, RAYMOND BUNN, ERIC MAURICE BURDETT, CHRISTOPHER BURDETTE, JACQUELINE ANNE BURDSALL, ADRIAN BURGESS, AIMEE M. BURKE, CHRIS BURKE, RONALD ERIC BURKHARDT, JR, KENNETH WAYNE BURLINGHAM, GORDON R. BURNEY, II, ROBERT LEE BURNS, JESSE BURRELL, BRIAN BURTSFIELD, BRIAN TROY BUSSEY, DANIEL ARTHUR BUTLER, JONATHAN CABRAL, DAYNE CALLABY, JR, BRIAN CALLOWAY, DEREK JAMES CAMERON, BRANDON CAMP, JEFFREY CAMPBELL, JOHN EDWARD CAMPBELL, JR, KENNETH CAMPBELL, JEFFREY CANCEL, BRADLEY WADE CARAVIELLO, DANIEL CARDENAS, JASON CARNES, TRAVIS RANDALL CARPENTER, PATRICK THOMAS CARROLL, RONALD CARTER, WILLIAM BRADLY CARTER, ZACHARY CASADA, JOSEPH CASANOVA, ETHAN OREN CASE, GABRIEL CASILLAS, DONNIE CASON, CHRISTOPHER CATT, BRANDON CENTRA, JOSE CERRATO, WILLIAM CHAMBERLAIN, DARREN CHAPMAN, DON CHAPMAN, TERRY CHAPMAN, DEMARIS CHAVIS, DAVID CHESSER, DANIEL CHILDERS, DAVID WEBSTER CHILDRESS, ANTONINO CHIOVARI, JAMES DOUGLAS CHITTENDEN, JR, SHANE ANTHONY CHRISS, JOSH CHRISTMON, ROBERT M. CHUBB, MICHAEL CHYTERBOK, HERBERT CLARK, LARRY CLARK, ETHAN CLARKE, ROBERT CLEMENTS, BRIAN LEE CLIBURN, GARRISON COBB, WILLIAM COCHRAN, VERONICA A. COFFEE, ROBERT COHEN, MYLES COLBETH, RON COLEMAN, STEVEN COLEMAN, KEITH COLLINS, GENARO COLON-VELEZ, MICHAEL LAURANCE CONANT, NATHALIE CONLEY, STEVE CONNELL, TERRY CONNER, ZEDRICK CONNER, CHRIS CONWAY, JOSEPH COOK, KRISTOPHER LEE COOK, PHILLIP COOK, PATRICK FITZGERALD COOPER, TERRANCE COOPER, WOODROW COOPER, ALAN COPE, KEVIN CORDRAY, CRAIG CORLEY, OTIS CORLEY, CAMERON CORSON, ROBERT CORTES, JOE COSTANZO, TED COTTON, ROBERT COUSER, GERMAN COELLO MARTINEZ. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 09/24 8:31 AM
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/24/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 09/24 7:19 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:15 MOTION to Seal Defendants'16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 09/24 8:49 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:14 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,16 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/23 8:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Remand to State Court [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-10 [Filed Under Seal],
Att: 3 Exhibit 11
15 15 motion Seal Mon 09/23 8:02 PM
MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
14 14 motion Remand to State Court Mon 09/09 6:29 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by DAVID BRYANT, JUSTIN BUCHMAN, SHANE BUCK, MARTIN BUCKNER, TIMOTHY RONALD BUCKNER, TONY MONDALE BUFFORD, THOMAS BUNGERT, RAYMOND BUNN, ERIC MAURICE BURDETT, CHRISTOPHER BURDETTE, JACQUELINE ANNE BURDSALL, ADRIAN BURGESS, AIMEE M. BURKE, CHRIS BURKE, RONALD ERIC BURKHARDT, JR, KENNETH WAYNE BURLINGHAM, GORDON R. BURNEY, II, ROBERT LEE BURNS, JESSE BURRELL, BRIAN BURTSFIELD, BRIAN TROY BUSSEY, DANIEL ARTHUR BUTLER, JONATHAN CABRAL, DAYNE CALLABY, JR, BRIAN CALLOWAY, DEREK JAMES CAMERON, BRANDON CAMP, JEFFREY CAMPBELL, JOHN EDWARD CAMPBELL, JR, KENNETH CAMPBELL, JEFFREY CANCEL, BRADLEY WADE CARAVIELLO, DANIEL CARDENAS, JASON CARNES, TRAVIS RANDALL CARPENTER, PATRICK THOMAS CARROLL, RONALD CARTER, WILLIAM BRADLY CARTER, ZACHARY CASADA, JOSEPH CASANOVA, ETHAN OREN CASE, GABRIEL CASILLAS, DONNIE CASON, CHRISTOPHER CATT, BRANDON CENTRA, JOSE CERRATO, WILLIAM CHAMBERLAIN, DARREN CHAPMAN, DON CHAPMAN, TERRY CHAPMAN, DEMARIS CHAVIS, DAVID CHESSER, DANIEL CHILDERS, DAVID WEBSTER CHILDRESS, ANTONINO CHIOVARI, JAMES DOUGLAS CHITTENDEN, JR, SHANE ANTHONY CHRISS, JOSH CHRISTMON, ROBERT M. CHUBB, MICHAEL CHYTERBOK, HERBERT CLARK, LARRY CLARK, ETHAN CLARKE, ROBERT CLEMENTS, BRIAN LEE CLIBURN, GARRISON COBB, WILLIAM COCHRAN, VERONICA A. COFFEE, ROBERT COHEN, MYLES COLBETH, RON COLEMAN, STEVEN COLEMAN, KEITH COLLINS, GENARO COLON-VELEZ, MICHAEL LAURANCE CONANT, NATHALIE CONLEY, STEVE CONNELL, TERRY CONNER, ZEDRICK CONNER, CHRIS CONWAY, JOSEPH COOK, KRISTOPHER LEE COOK, PHILLIP COOK, PATRICK FITZGERALD COOPER, TERRANCE COOPER, WOODROW COOPER, ALAN COPE, KEVIN CORDRAY, CRAIG CORLEY, OTIS CORLEY, CAMERON CORSON, ROBERT CORTES, JOE COSTANZO, TED COTTON, ROBERT COUSER, GERMAN COELLO MARTINEZ. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/10 8:08 AM
Set Deadlines re14 MOTION To Remand To State Court. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/23/2019) . (MB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B SINGLETON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 08/20 4:22 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02188. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/20 11:30 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
10 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Gerald Singleton, Amanda M. LoCurto as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2188 (DWF-TNL). (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,,,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District, Ramsey County, case number 62-cv 19-5258 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7070495) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M Occupational Safety,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Holdings,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Intermediate LLC,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo, LLC,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Technologies,
Att: 8 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet