Kane et al v. Turkey Hill, L.P.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joanna Seybert |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-04794 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2020 4:22 AM EST |
Defendant
Turkey Hill, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Kane
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 05/27 10:18 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (D.E. 15) is SO-ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mark this case CLOSED. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 5/27/2020. (Brown, Melissa) |
||
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/26 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jane Doe, Russell Kane against defendant, with prejudice (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 05/11 9:58 AM
ORDER re14 : The time for Turkey Hill, L.P. to answer, mover or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including June 15, 2020. The June 10, 2020, initial conference is adjourned to July 15, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The parties are directed to submit a proposed scheduling order for the completion of discovery on, or before, July 13, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/11/2020. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 05/06 10:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Turkey Hill, L.P.. (Sanderson, Joseph) |
|
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/24 1:40 PM
Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/24/2020. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/21 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Reese on behalf of Russell Kane (aty to be noticed) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 02/25 8:45 AM
ORDER granting11 : The time for the defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 5/13/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/25/2020. c/ecf (Miller, Dina) |
||
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 02/24 9:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Turkey Hill, L.P.. (Sanderson, Joseph) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 12/27 12:06 PM
ORDER re10 : The time for Turkey Hill, L.P. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including March 13, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/27/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 12/26 1:24 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Turkey Hill, L.P.. (Sanderson, Joseph) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/26 1:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Turkey Hill, L.P. (Sanderson, Joseph) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/26 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Myer Sanderson on behalf of Turkey Hill, L.P. (aty to be noticed) (Sanderson, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 11/14 1:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Russell Kane, Jane Doe. Turkey Hill, L.P. waiver sent on 11/12/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/25 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben Nathan on behalf of Jane Doe, Russell Kane (notification declined or already on case) (Nathan, Reuben) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/19 10:12 AM
ORDER re5 : The Motion of Reuben D. Nathan for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee .Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/19/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/18 12:58 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11859323. by Jane Doe, Russell Kane. (Nathan, Reuben) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support | ||
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/21 10:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Turkey Hill, L.P. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 08/21 10:03 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 08/21 9:55 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/21 10:02 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/20 10:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Turkey Hill, L.P. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11778659 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Russell Kane, Jane Doe. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |