New York Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Wolford
Referred: Michael J Roemer
Case #: 1:19-cv-01108
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2019
Terminated:Apr 14, 2021
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2020 4:43 AM EST
Defendant
Praxair, Inc.
175 East Park Drive
Tonawanda, NY 14150
Represented By
Linda H. Joseph
Schroder, Joseph & Associates, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Joseph F. Saeli, Jr.
Plaintiff
Edward Wisniewski
Represented By
Charles L. Miller, II
Law Office Of Lindy Korn
contact info
Lindy Korn
Electric Tower
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/14 1:01 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/14/2021. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/14 9:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Edward Wisniewski. (Miller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
24 24 motion Adjourn Tue 04/13 2:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Praxair, Inc..(Joseph, Linda)
Related: [-]
adr ADR Plan Tue 04/13 8:53 AM
*DISREGARD - Filed on wrong case. ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(CGJ) Modified on 4/13/2021 (CGJ)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Tue 04/13 9:03 AM
E-Filing Notification: Please disregard ADR Plan entry, filed in error. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Tue 04/13 12:57 PM
E-Filing Notification: re23 Letter. This document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
23 23 misc Letter Mon 04/12 1:01 PM
Letter filed by Praxair, Inc. as to Praxair, Inc. regarding cancellation of hearing . (Joseph, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/19 2:27 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE as to22 First MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 4/2/2021. Replies due by 4/9/2021. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2021 10:30 AM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
22 22 motion Compel Fri 03/12 6:54 PM
First MOTION to Compel by Edward Wisniewski.(Miller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 3 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 23, 2020
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/23 10:53 AM
SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 11/27/2020. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 12/28/2020. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 3/12/2021. Discovery completed by 4/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2021. Mediation To End by 5/26/2021. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 10/23/2020. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/23 10:53 AM
SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 11/27/2020. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 12/28/2020. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 3/12/2021. Discovery completed by 4/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2021. Mediation To End by 5/26/2021. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 10/23/2020. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/23 10:44 AM
TEXT ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. An amended case management order to be issued. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 10/23/2020. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/23 10:44 AM
TEXT ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. An amended case management order to be issued. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 10/23/2020. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 10/21 4:16 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Edward Wisniewski.(Miller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 18, 2020
18 18 order Stipulation and Order Fri 09/18 12:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/18/2020. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Fri 09/18 10:30 AM
Letter filed by Praxair, Inc. as to Praxair, Inc. re: Stipulated Confidentiality Order .(Joseph, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 11, 2020
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/11 3:53 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) . Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 9/28/2020. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 10/26/2020. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 12/11/2020. Discovery completed by 1/11/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2021. Mediation To End by 2/26/2021. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 5/11/2020. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 05/11 3:35 PM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. An amended case management order to be issued. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 5/11/2020. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 04/24 1:27 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Edward Wisniewski.(Miller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Friday, November 08, 2019
11 11 adr Mediation Certification Fri 11/08 3:14 PM
Mediation Certification by Joseph F. Saeli, Jr. Not settled, mediation complete.(AGW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
10 10 adr Stipulation-Selection of Mediator Tue 11/05 10:38 AM
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Edward Wisniewski(Korn, Lindy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/11 11:42 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 11/29/2019. Mandatory Disclosures due by 12/16/2019. First Mediation Session due by 12/30/2019. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 1/24/2020. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 5/28/2020. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 6/25/2020. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 8/10/2020. Discovery completed by 9/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2020. Mediation To End by 10/26/2020. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 10/31/2019. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 11/11 11:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: Charles L. Miller, II, Esq. on behalf of pltf; Linda H. Joseph, Esq. on behalf of deft. Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/31/2019. Discussions held regarding case management deadlines, the option to consent to proceed before the magistrate judge and mediation. Case Management Order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/25 9:04 AM
ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 01:00 PM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/25/2019. (RAZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
7 7 order Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/18 2:37 PM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Michael J. Roemer for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions.(SG)
Related: [-]
adr ADR Plan Wed 09/18 3:26 PM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/17 2:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Praxair, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Linde, PLC for Praxair, Inc... (Joseph, Linda)
Related: [-]
5 5 23 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/17 2:04 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by Praxair, Inc..(Joseph, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 08/30 3:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John McCarthy on 8/28/2019, filed by Edward Wisniewski. (Korn, Lindy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/26 3:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Praxair, Inc.. (SG)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/26 3:53 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 08/26 3:53 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] (SG)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 08/26 3:54 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (SG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
2 2 misc Continuation of Exhibits Fri 08/23 1:30 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet . (Korn, Lindy)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Fri 08/23 11:08 AM
E-Filing Notification: re1 COMPLAINT; Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet using the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies.(SG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/22 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Praxair, Inc., filed by Edward Wisniewski.(Korn, Lindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 08/23 11:04 AM
Electronic Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 0209-3560691. (SG)
Related: [-]