Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-40811

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 4:19-ap-04040
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2019
Terminated:Nov 04, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Deborah A. Hurley
8 Juniper Road
Upton, MA 01568
Represented By
David B. Madoff
Madoff & Khoury LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Erin Brizius
Doj-Usao D Mass
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, November 04, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 11/04 12:53 PM
Disposition of Adversary Number 19-4040 Dismissed or Settled Without Entry of Judgment Complaint. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/04 12:54 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-4040 Closed. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 19, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/21 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Dismissing Case
Thursday, October 17, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte) Thu 10/17 2:52 PM
Endorsed Order dated 10/17/2019 Re:9 Stipulation and Order By Plaintiff United States of America and Defendant Deborah A. Hurley. APPROVED. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 29, 2019 IS CANCELLED. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 09/26 10:02 AM
Stipulation and Order By Plaintiff United States of America and Defendant Deborah A. Hurley with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Brizius, Erin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 20, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/21 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/18 1:09 PM
Preliminary Scheduling Order dated 9/18/2019 Re:1 Complaint by United States of America against Deborah A. Hurley. See Order for Full Text. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Continued/Rescheduled (No Forms Attached) Wed 09/18 1:11 PM
Telephonic Case Management Conference Scheduled for 10/29/2019 at 09:30 AM at Worcester Courtroom 3 - CJP Re:1 Complaint by United States of America against Deborah A. Hurley. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/17 2:29 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Deborah A. Hurley. (Pelton, Steffani)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Sat 08/24 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Add Attorney for Debtor
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/21 4:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Deborah A. Hurley 8/21/2019 (Brizius, Erin)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 08/21 3:47 PM
Summons Issued on Deborah A. Hurley. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. Answer Due 9/20/2019. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Add Attorney for Debtor Wed 08/21 3:46 PM
Attorney David B. Madoff for Defendant Deborah A. Hurley added to Adversary Proceeding 4:19-ap-4040 pursuant MLBR 9010-2. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/21 3:22 PM
Adversary case 19-04040 Complaint by United States of America against Deborah A. Hurley. Fee Amount $0.00 Receipt Number EXEMPT. Nature of Suit(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(Brizius, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8