Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03244
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2019
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02205
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2020 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
S Jamal Faleel
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
BENJAMIN W HULSE
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Faris Rashid
Greene Espel Pllp
contact info
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
JOSEPH TAPIA
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
SLYKE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CODY P. TARBLE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLEN TATE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTOINE TAYLOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEWAYNE TAYLOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JENEE TAYLOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL TAYLOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
VICTOR SCOTT TAYLOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NATHANIEL CHARLES TEAGUE, III
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL TEMPLE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BENJAMIN TENNEY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN TERAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GARRETT TERRAL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE TEZA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN THOENNES
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALONZO THOMAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JEROME THOMAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMMITHY THOMAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIE THOMAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WYATT DE'WANTRE THOMAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON THOMPSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAKOTA THOMPSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL PORTER THOMPSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TREMAINE THOMPSON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL THORPE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN THRASHER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID HEATH THREADGILL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLIE THRUSH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSHUA THURMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SIEGFRIED TIEGS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RORKE TIFANNY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID TILLMAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL TO'OTO'O
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM EDWARD TODD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TARONA TOLBERT
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT TOLER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT TOLLER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRETT TOMBIC
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON TORRES
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NOEL TORRES
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN TOTH
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON JAMES TOZIER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NOEL TRAMEL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHISOLM CASSAI TRAMMELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRUCE TRAYLOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
D'ANDRE JAWON TRAYLOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK ALLEN TREASURE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSHUA TRIVETTE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSHUA TRUESDELL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ALAN TUCK
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEVYN TUCKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSHUA TUCKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ZACARIAH TURNBULL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHAD TURNER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JARED TURNER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN MATTHEW TUTTLE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ADAM TYLER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRADY ULERY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSHUA ULMER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JERRELL UNDERWOOD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CLAYTON VADNAIS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
LUIS VALDEZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW VALENTE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CANDICE ALYCE VALENTINE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD VAN JOSHUA VANDUKE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRIS VANGOETHEM
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GILBERT VARGAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
IVONNE VARGAS
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFF VARTULI
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH VASQUEZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STACEY ALTON VAUGHAN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RUBY VEGA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL VELAZQUEZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIAS VELAZQUEZ
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON VERA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
NATHAN VERDEN
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMUEL MAGEE VERNON
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW VERSPOOR
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM VIDAL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC SCOTT VISKOE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON JEFFREY VIX
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON JOSEPH VOELKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ROGER DOMINIQUE WADE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
TYLER WADE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BENJAMIN WAGA
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN WAHL
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARTIN EMMERSON WAKEFIELD
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
RAHIM WALIANY
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CALVIN WALKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ELBERT WALKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
GARY WALKER
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
BRANDON LEE WALLACE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES EVERETTE WALLACE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN WALLACE
Terminated: 01/13/2020
Represented By
Timothy M Phillips
contact info
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
26 26 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 12:08 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/17 4:50 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOSEPH TAPIA. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
24 24 17 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 10:21 AM
AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 10/28 9:19 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:23 Plaintiffs' Objections to21 Pretrial Order No. 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
23 23 respoth Response/Reply Fri 10/25 9:27 PM
RESPONSE by SLYKE, JOSEPH TAPIA, CODY P. TARBLE, ALLEN TATE, ANTOINE TAYLOR, DEWAYNE TAYLOR, JENEE TAYLOR, MICHAEL TAYLOR, VICTOR SCOTT TAYLOR, NATHANIEL CHARLES TEAGUE, III, PAUL TEMPLE, BENJAMIN TENNEY, STEVEN TERAN, GARRETT TERRAL, LAWRENCE TEZA, JONATHAN THOENNES, ALONZO THOMAS, JEROME THOMAS, TIMMITHY THOMAS, WILLIE THOMAS, WYATT DE'WANTRE THOMAS, AARON THOMPSON, DAKOTA THOMPSON, MICHAEL PORTER THOMPSON, TREMAINE THOMPSON, MICHAEL THORPE, JONATHAN THRASHER, DAVID HEATH THREADGILL, CHARLIE THRUSH, JOSHUA THURMAN, SIEGFRIED TIEGS, RORKE TIFANNY, DAVID TILLMAN, DANIEL TO'OTO'O, WILLIAM EDWARD TODD, TARONA TOLBERT, ROBERT TOLER, ROBERT TOLLER, BRETT TOMBIC, JASON TORRES, NOEL TORRES, STEVEN TOTH, AARON JAMES TOZIER, NOEL TRAMEL, CHISOLM CASSAI TRAMMELL, BRUCE TRAYLOR, D'ANDRE JAWON TRAYLOR, MARK ALLEN TREASURE, JOSHUA TRIVETTE, JOSHUA TRUESDELL, ALAN TUCK, DEVYN TUCKER, JOSHUA TUCKER, ZACARIAH TURNBULL, CHAD TURNER, JARED TURNER, JOHN MATTHEW TUTTLE, ADAM TYLER, BRADY ULERY, JOSHUA ULMER, JERRELL UNDERWOOD, CLAYTON VADNAIS, LUIS VALDEZ, MATTHEW VALENTE, CANDICE ALYCE VALENTINE, RICHARD VAN JOSHUA VANDUKE, CHRIS VANGOETHEM, GILBERT VARGAS, IVONNE VARGAS, JEFF VARTULI, JOSEPH VASQUEZ, STACEY ALTON VAUGHAN, RUBY VEGA, DANIEL VELAZQUEZ, ELIAS VELAZQUEZ, AARON VERA, NATHAN VERDEN, SAMUEL MAGEE VERNON, MATTHEW VERSPOOR, WILLIAM VIDAL, ERIC SCOTT VISKOE, AARON JEFFREY VIX, AARON JOSEPH VOELKER, ROGER DOMINIQUE WADE, TYLER WADE, BENJAMIN WAGA, RYAN WAHL, MARTIN EMMERSON WAKEFIELD, RAHIM WALIANY, CALVIN WALKER, ELBERT WALKER, GARY WALKER, BRANDON LEE WALLACE, JAMES EVERETTE WALLACE, KEVIN WALLACE re21 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, . (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, October 18, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 10/18 7:25 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:15 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,17 Response in Opposition to Motion,22 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/17 6:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SLYKE, JOSEPH TAPIA, CODY P. TARBLE, ALLEN TATE, ANTOINE TAYLOR, DEWAYNE TAYLOR, JENEE TAYLOR, MICHAEL TAYLOR, VICTOR SCOTT TAYLOR, NATHANIEL CHARLES TEAGUE, III, PAUL TEMPLE, BENJAMIN TENNEY, STEVEN TERAN, GARRETT TERRAL, LAWRENCE TEZA, JONATHAN THOENNES, ALONZO THOMAS, JEROME THOMAS, TIMMITHY THOMAS, WILLIE THOMAS, WYATT DE'WANTRE THOMAS, AARON THOMPSON, DAKOTA THOMPSON, MICHAEL PORTER THOMPSON, TREMAINE THOMPSON, MICHAEL THORPE, JONATHAN THRASHER, DAVID HEATH THREADGILL, CHARLIE THRUSH, JOSHUA THURMAN, SIEGFRIED TIEGS, RORKE TIFANNY, DAVID TILLMAN, DANIEL TO'OTO'O, WILLIAM EDWARD TODD, TARONA TOLBERT, ROBERT TOLER, ROBERT TOLLER, BRETT TOMBIC, JASON TORRES, NOEL TORRES, STEVEN TOTH, AARON JAMES TOZIER, NOEL TRAMEL, CHISOLM CASSAI TRAMMELL, BRUCE TRAYLOR, D'ANDRE JAWON TRAYLOR, MARK ALLEN TREASURE, JOSHUA TRIVETTE, JOSHUA TRUESDELL, ALAN TUCK, DEVYN TUCKER, JOSHUA TUCKER, ZACARIAH TURNBULL, CHAD TURNER, JARED TURNER, JOHN MATTHEW TUTTLE, ADAM TYLER, BRADY ULERY, JOSHUA ULMER, JERRELL UNDERWOOD, CLAYTON VADNAIS, LUIS VALDEZ, MATTHEW VALENTE, CANDICE ALYCE VALENTINE, RICHARD VAN JOSHUA VANDUKE, CHRIS VANGOETHEM, GILBERT VARGAS, IVONNE VARGAS, JEFF VARTULI, JOSEPH VASQUEZ, STACEY ALTON VAUGHAN, RUBY VEGA, DANIEL VELAZQUEZ, ELIAS VELAZQUEZ, AARON VERA, NATHAN VERDEN, SAMUEL MAGEE VERNON, MATTHEW VERSPOOR, WILLIAM VIDAL, ERIC SCOTT VISKOE, AARON JEFFREY VIX, AARON JOSEPH VOELKER, ROGER DOMINIQUE WADE, TYLER WADE, BENJAMIN WAGA, RYAN WAHL, MARTIN EMMERSON WAKEFIELD, RAHIM WALIANY, CALVIN WALKER, ELBERT WALKER, GARY WALKER, BRANDON LEE WALLACE, JAMES EVERETTE WALLACE, KEVIN WALLACE. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
21 21 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 10/16 12:54 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which a remand motion is currently pending, the individual plaintiffs may either: Withdraw the motion to remand within 14 days of the date of this Order, and thereafter be dismissed without prejudice and with the right to file individual complaints in accordance with this Order; or File an objection to this Order, not to exceed two pages, on the docket for their original multi-plaintiff action by October 25, 2019 . Any plaintiffs who object will not be severed until the objection is resolved by the Court. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. It is the parties' responsibility to review and abide by all orders entered in this MDL. All orders on the master docket for the MDL may be accessed through the CM/ECF system and key orders are available on the Court's public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/mdl2885. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Withdraws due by 10/29/2019 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 10/10 11:13 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Reply memoranda are due by October 17, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/10 11:24 AM
Set Deadlines Replies due by 10/17/2019 . (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 10/09 8:30 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand re17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Tue 10/08 5:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to File re17 Response in Opposition to Motion, to remand by SLYKE, JOSEPH TAPIA, CODY P. TARBLE, ALLEN TATE, ANTOINE TAYLOR, DEWAYNE TAYLOR, JENEE TAYLOR, MICHAEL TAYLOR, VICTOR SCOTT TAYLOR, NATHANIEL CHARLES TEAGUE, III, PAUL TEMPLE, BENJAMIN TENNEY, STEVEN TERAN, GARRETT TERRAL, LAWRENCE TEZA, JONATHAN THOENNES, ALONZO THOMAS, JEROME THOMAS, TIMMITHY THOMAS, WILLIE THOMAS, WYATT DE'WANTRE THOMAS, AARON THOMPSON, DAKOTA THOMPSON, MICHAEL PORTER THOMPSON, TREMAINE THOMPSON, MICHAEL THORPE, JONATHAN THRASHER, DAVID HEATH THREADGILL, CHARLIE THRUSH, JOSHUA THURMAN, SIEGFRIED TIEGS, RORKE TIFANNY, DAVID TILLMAN, DANIEL TO'OTO'O, WILLIAM EDWARD TODD, TARONA TOLBERT, ROBERT TOLER, ROBERT TOLLER, BRETT TOMBIC, JASON TORRES, NOEL TORRES, STEVEN TOTH, AARON JAMES TOZIER, NOEL TRAMEL, CHISOLM CASSAI TRAMMELL, BRUCE TRAYLOR, D'ANDRE JAWON TRAYLOR, MARK ALLEN TREASURE, JOSHUA TRIVETTE, JOSHUA TRUESDELL, ALAN TUCK, DEVYN TUCKER, JOSHUA TUCKER, ZACARIAH TURNBULL, CHAD TURNER, JARED TURNER, JOHN MATTHEW TUTTLE, ADAM TYLER, BRADY ULERY, JOSHUA ULMER, JERRELL UNDERWOOD, CLAYTON VADNAIS, LUIS VALDEZ, MATTHEW VALENTE, CANDICE ALYCE VALENTINE, RICHARD VAN JOSHUA VANDUKE, CHRIS VANGOETHEM, GILBERT VARGAS, IVONNE VARGAS, JEFF VARTULI, JOSEPH VASQUEZ, STACEY ALTON VAUGHAN, RUBY VEGA, DANIEL VELAZQUEZ, ELIAS VELAZQUEZ, AARON VERA, NATHAN VERDEN, SAMUEL MAGEE VERNON, MATTHEW VERSPOOR, WILLIAM VIDAL, ERIC SCOTT VISKOE, AARON JEFFREY VIX, AARON JOSEPH VOELKER, ROGER DOMINIQUE WADE, TYLER WADE, BENJAMIN WAGA, RYAN WAHL, MARTIN EMMERSON WAKEFIELD, RAHIM WALIANY, CALVIN WALKER, ELBERT WALKER, GARY WALKER, BRANDON LEE WALLACE, JAMES EVERETTE WALLACE, KEVIN WALLACE. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 09/25 8:09 AM
ORDER granting 16 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/25/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 09/25 10:43 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:15 MOTION to Remand to State Court,17 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/24 7:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb,
Att: 2 Exhibits 1-10 [Filed Under Seal],
Att: 3 Exhibit 11
16 16 motion Seal Tue 09/24 7:36 PM
MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Tue 09/10 1:58 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by SLYKE, JOSEPH TAPIA, CODY P. TARBLE, ALLEN TATE, ANTOINE TAYLOR, DEWAYNE TAYLOR, JENEE TAYLOR, MICHAEL TAYLOR, VICTOR SCOTT TAYLOR, NATHANIEL CHARLES TEAGUE, III, PAUL TEMPLE, BENJAMIN TENNEY, STEVEN TERAN, GARRETT TERRAL, LAWRENCE TEZA, JONATHAN THOENNES, ALONZO THOMAS, JEROME THOMAS, TIMMITHY THOMAS, WILLIE THOMAS, WYATT DE'WANTRE THOMAS, AARON THOMPSON, DAKOTA THOMPSON, MICHAEL PORTER THOMPSON, TREMAINE THOMPSON, MICHAEL THORPE, JONATHAN THRASHER, DAVID HEATH THREADGILL, CHARLIE THRUSH, JOSHUA THURMAN, SIEGFRIED TIEGS, RORKE TIFANNY, DAVID TILLMAN, DANIEL TO'OTO'O, WILLIAM EDWARD TODD, TARONA TOLBERT, ROBERT TOLER, ROBERT TOLLER, BRETT TOMBIC, JASON TORRES, NOEL TORRES, STEVEN TOTH, AARON JAMES TOZIER, NOEL TRAMEL, CHISOLM CASSAI TRAMMELL, BRUCE TRAYLOR, D'ANDRE JAWON TRAYLOR, MARK ALLEN TREASURE, JOSHUA TRIVETTE, JOSHUA TRUESDELL, ALAN TUCK, DEVYN TUCKER, JOSHUA TUCKER, ZACARIAH TURNBULL, CHAD TURNER, JARED TURNER, JOHN MATTHEW TUTTLE, ADAM TYLER, BRADY ULERY, JOSHUA ULMER, JERRELL UNDERWOOD, CLAYTON VADNAIS, LUIS VALDEZ, MATTHEW VALENTE, CANDICE ALYCE VALENTINE, RICHARD VAN JOSHUA VANDUKE, CHRIS VANGOETHEM, GILBERT VARGAS, IVONNE VARGAS, JEFF VARTULI, JOSEPH VASQUEZ, STACEY ALTON VAUGHAN, RUBY VEGA, DANIEL VELAZQUEZ, ELIAS VELAZQUEZ, AARON VERA, NATHAN VERDEN, SAMUEL MAGEE VERNON, MATTHEW VERSPOOR, WILLIAM VIDAL, ERIC SCOTT VISKOE, AARON JEFFREY VIX, AARON JOSEPH VOELKER, ROGER DOMINIQUE WADE, TYLER WADE, BENJAMIN WAGA, RYAN WAHL, MARTIN EMMERSON WAKEFIELD, RAHIM WALIANY, CALVIN WALKER, ELBERT WALKER, GARY WALKER, BRANDON LEE WALLACE, JAMES EVERETTE WALLACE, KEVIN WALLACE. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/11 8:32 AM
Set Deadlines re15 MOTION To Remand To State Court (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/24/2019) . (MB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B SINGLETON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
13 13 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 08/22 1:58 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb)
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/22 1:57 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02205. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/22 10:14 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
10 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
5 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Gerald Singleton, Amanda M. LoCurto as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2205 NEB/HB. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, case number 62-cv 19-5261 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7073897) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet