New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ann M Donnelly
Referred: Magistrate Jud Roanne L Mann
Case #: 1:19-cv-04801
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2019
Terminated:Jun 09, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2020 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
Achievement First East Brooklyn High School
301 Vermont Street
Brooklyn, NY 11207
Defendant
Kathryn Lewis
301 Vermont Street
Brooklyn, NY 11207
Defendant
Alicia Robinson
301 Vermont Street
Brooklyn, NY 11207
Defendant
Sabrina Silver
301 Vermont Street
Brooklyn, NY 11207
Plaintiff
Christian Williams
718 Marcy Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11216
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Achievement First East Brooklyn High School Principal
Terminated: 10/11/2019
Defendant
Director of School Operations & Dean of Students
Terminated: 10/11/2019

GPO Oct 11 2019
ORDER re 8 Letter, 1 Complaint filed by Christian Williams. This Court deems the Complaint amended to name the defendants listed in plaintiff's 8 Letter and directs the Clerk of Court to amend the docket sheet accordingly. Moreover, the Clerk is directed to re-issue summonses to those defendants. Plaintiff shall promptly advise the court once the defendants have been served or plaintiff receives waivers of service. Accordingly, if service is not waived or made upon the defendants by November 13, 2019 or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, it will be recommended that the Court dismiss this action without prejudice. See attached for further discussion. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/11/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)

Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/09 10:34 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (Greene, Donna)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
17 17 motion Dismiss Wed 06/10 9:14 AM
MOTION to Dismiss this case without prejudice by Christian Williams. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
order Scheduling Order Wed 05/06 2:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: On March 11, 2020, the plaintiff advised the Court that he was no longer pursuing this case, but that he was contemplating his remaining options16 . Out of an abundance of caution, the Court ordered the plaintiff to confirm his intent to dismiss this case. The plaintiff did not respond. The plaintiff has until June 8, 2020, to respond to the Court's order. If the plaintiff does not respond by June 8, 2020, I will dismiss the case. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/6/2020. (Lefkowitz, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
order Scheduling Order Tue 03/17 3:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: It is not clear from the plaintiff's letter16 whether he is dismissing this case. Therefore, the plaintiff is directed to confirm in writing by May 1, 2020, that he is in fact dismissing this case against the defendants. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 3/17/2020. (Lefkowitz, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
16 16 misc Letter Thu 03/12 1:22 PM
Letter from Christian Williams to Judge Donnelly and Judge Mann dated 3/9/20 re: no longer pursing litigation against Achievement First East Brooklyn High School and contemplating remaining options. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
order Order(Other) Tue 03/03 11:23 AM
ORDER Re DE #15: In a letter dated March 2, 2020, pro se plaintiff Christian Williams expresses his interest in "negotiating an agreement" with defendant Achievement First East Brooklyn High School. However, he ignores the fact that the court-ordered extension by which he was required to serve the defendant with the summons and complaint and to file proof of service expired on March 2, 2020. In the absence of service on the defendant, there is no defendant with whom to negotiate. Plaintiff will be given one final extension to cure this omission and file proof of service: If proof of service has not been filed by March 9, 2020 , plaintiff risks dismissal of his complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/3/2020. (LK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
15 15 misc Letter Tue 03/03 10:39 AM
Letter from Christian Williams to Judge Donnelly and Judge Mann dated 3/2/20 re: negotiating an agreement. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
14 14 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/17 4:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re13 Letter: the Court declines to grant plaintiff's request for another 90 days to effect service; instead, plaintiff is directed to complete service of process, and file proof of service, by March 2, 2020. See attached. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/17/2020. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
13 13 misc Letter Fri 01/17 4:28 PM
Letter from Christian Williams to Judge Donnelly and Judge Mann dated 1/16/20 re: extension to previous deadline. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
order Order(Other) Mon 12/23 4:55 PM
ORDER. In light of pro se plaintiff's discussions with representatives of the Pro Se office, The Court will give plaintiff until January 17, 2020 to effect service on the defendants. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/23/2019. (LK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
12 12 misc Letter Wed 12/18 9:39 AM
Letter from Christian Williams to Judge Donnelly and Judge Mann dated 12/17/19 re: case and extension to previous deadline (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 12/02 5:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Although the Clerk's Office re-issued summonses on October 17, 2019, it appears that the Complaint has not been served on defendants. Plaintiff is now directed to show cause, in writing, by December 16, 2019, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution, pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in a recommendation that the case be dismissed. See attached for further discussion . Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/2/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 1:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Achievement First East Brooklyn High School, Kathryn Lewis, Alicia Robinson, Sabrina Silver. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
9 9 order Order(Other) Fri 10/11 3:51 PM
ORDER re8 Letter,1 Complaint filed by Christian Williams. This Court deems the Complaint amended to name the defendants listed in plaintiff's8 Letter and directs the Clerk of Court to amend the docket sheet accordingly. Moreover, the Clerk is directed to re-issue summonses to those defendants. Plaintiff shall promptly advise the court once the defendants have been served or plaintiff receives waivers of service. Accordingly, if service is not waived or made upon the defendants by November 13, 2019 or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, it will be recommended that the Court dismiss this action without prejudice. See attached for further discussion . Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/11/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Fri 10/11 1:16 PM
Letter from Christian Williams to Judge Mann dated 10/11/19 stating the defendants on the case along with other individuals. (see letter for details). (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
7 7 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/24 10:03 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re1 Complaint filed by Christian Williams. In light of the ambiguity in the complaint, plaintiff must file a letter by October 1, 2019, identifying the individuals and/or entities that he intended to name as defendants in this action. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/24/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
6 6 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 09/17 11:36 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653143668. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Achievement First East Brooklyn High School Principal. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/03 5:36 PM
ORDER: The plaintiffs request to proceed IFP is denied without prejudice. The plaintiff must file an amended IFP application or pay the $400 filing fee to the Clerk of Court within 14 days from the date of this order to proceed with this action. If the plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the case will be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to send an IFP form to the plaintiff with this order. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/3/2019. (Greene, Donna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 08/22 9:48 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christian Williams. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Achievement First East Brooklyn High School Principal, Director of School Operations & Dean of Students, filed by Christian Williams. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet