Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Ronnie L White
Case #: 4:14-cv-00453
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2014
Terminated:Apr 11, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 9:27 AM CST
Defendant
At&t Services Inc.
Represented By
Michael P. Daly
Drinker And Biddle
contact info
Paula Finlay
At&t Missouri
contact info
Defendant
Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By
Michael P. Daly
Drinker And Biddle
contact info
Paula Finlay
At&t Missouri
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Everett Johnson
individually, and on behalf of all others 4421 Forrest Avenue
Kansas City, MO 64110
Represented By
Charles J. Brown
Brown And Associates, LLC
contact info
Jayson A. Watkins
Brown And Associates, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AT&T Corp.
Terminated: 08/01/2014
Represented By
Michael P. Daly
Drinker And Biddle
contact info
Melanie M. Barnes
Drinker And Biddle
contact info
Andrew B. Joseph
Drinker And Biddle
contact info
Paula Finlay
At&t Missouri
contact info

GPO Jul 21 2014
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of the Complaint and to Strike Plaintiff's Request for Injunctive Relief 6 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Plaintiff is granted seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. The Court strikes Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) Motion to Defer Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Permit Limited Discovery 13 is DENIED as moot.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/21/14. (LGK)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 11, 2016
63 63 order Judgment - (Case) Mon 04/11 3:05 PM
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT...This matter having come before the Court on April 7, 2016, upon the Parties1 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (ECF No.61 ), the evidence and arguments of counsel presented at the Court's Final Fairness Hearing, and the submissions filed with this Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 4/11/2016. (NEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
62 62 minutes In Court Hearing Thu 04/07 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Ronnie L. White: In Court Hearing held on 4/7/2016. Parties present for a Settlement Hearing. Parties present argument for the joint motion61 . Matter taken under submission. (Court Reporter:D. Kriegshauser.) (FTR Gold: No.) (KCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
61 61 motion Settlement Tue 04/05 9:06 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Plaintiff Steven Everett Johnson.(Watkins, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration