Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Louis Guirola, Jr
Referred: John C Gargiulo
Case #: 1:14-cv-00122
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2014
Terminated:Aug 22, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 9:27 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Coast Collection Agency, Inc.
Represented By
William V. Westbrook, III
Page, Mannino, Peresich, & Mcdermott, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Eric Brian Rosenberg
4002 Lacroux Court
Ocean Springs, MS 39564
Represented By
Albert H. Pettigrew
Albert H. Pettigrew, Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Coast Collection Agency, Inc.
Represented By
William V. Westbrook, III
Page, Mannino, Peresich, & Mcdermott, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Brian Rosenberg
4002 Lacroux Court
Ocean Springs, MS 39564
Represented By
Albert H. Pettigrew
Albert H. Pettigrew, Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, September 26, 2014
TEXT ONLY ORDER denying49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The parties are admonished to abide by the terms of the Settlement Agreement. The Court defers consideration of sanctions at this time but continues to retain jurisdiction over the parties for the purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement pursuant to the Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice48 entered on August 22, 2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/26/14 (JB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 25, 2014
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #51: Incorrect linkage made. The Reply to Response to Motion should be linked to49 Motion. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (RLW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 24, 2014
51 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re49 Motion for Leave to Withdraw by Albert Pettigrew attorney for Plaintiff, filed by Eric Brian Rosenberg (Pettigrew, Albert) Modified on 9/25/2014 to create relationship to document #49 and remove relationship to document #50 (RLW).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Pettigrew 28 USC 1746 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A1 List of Exhibits to Ex A,
Att: 3 Exhibit A2 09/16/14 1545 PM Westbrook response to Plaintiffs email providing Defendant documents to justify deletion of adverse credit report information,
Att: 4 Exhibit A3 09/16/14 1606 PM Pettigrew request to Westbrook to sign attached agreed order allow Pettigrew to withdraw as attorney of record for Plaintiff,
Att: 5 Exhibit A4 9/16/14 1628 PM Westbrook declination to sign proposed withdrawal order,
Att: 6 Exhibit A5 9/16/14 1650 PM Pettigrew email to Westbrook requesting notice of any breach of agreement alleged by Defendant,
Att: 7 Exhibit A6 9/17/14 1625 PM Westbrook notice to judge that Defendant objects to the proposed withdrawal order,
Att: 8 Exhibit B Rosenberg 28 USC 1746 Declaration