Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-16636
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2019
Terminated:May 14, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday May 18, 2021 1:36 AM PDT
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By
Andrew Jay Wiener
AGCA - Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CALIFORNIA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA DENTAL ASSOCIATION; and CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Cassidy C. Davenport
Cole Pedroza LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP
Represented By
Melanie Benesh
Environmental Working Group
contact info
Caroline Leary
Environmental Working Group
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE FOUNDATION, FARMWORKER ASSOCIATION OF FLORIDA, FARMWORKER JUSTICE, MIGRANT CLINICIANS NETWORK, PESTICIDE ACTION NETWORK, UNITED FARM WORKERS, AND UFW FOUNDATION
Represented By
Alexis Andiman
Earthjustice
contact info
Peter Lehner
Earthjustice
contact info
Patti A. Goldman
Earthjustice
contact info
Carrie Apfel
Earthjustice
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By
Ryan Talbott
Center for Food Safety
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Represented By
Ryan Talbott
Center for Food Safety
contact info
Amicus Curiae
PUBLIC LAW SCHOLARS
Represented By
Ashley Keller
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Travis D. Lenkner
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Warren David Postman
Keller Lenkner
contact info
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE
Represented By
Matthew W.H. Wessler
Gupta Wessler PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Represented By
Adina Hyman Rosenbaum
Public Citizen Litigation Group
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND MANUFACTURERS OF AMERICA
Represented By
William R. Stein
HUGHES HUBBARD & REED, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF IDAHO; STATE OF LOUISIANA; STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA; STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA; STATE OF TEXAS; and STATE OF UTAH
Represented By
Maegan L. Woita
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Joshua E. Dethlefsen
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Justin D. Lavene
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Amicus Curiae
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Matthew Oakes
DOJ - US Department of Justice
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GENENTECH INC.
Represented By
Laura W. Brill
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CROPLIFE AMERICA
Represented By
Shannen Wayne Coffin
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
MONSANTO COMPANY
Represented By
Richard P. Bress
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael X. Imbroscio
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Eric G. Lasker
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
contact info
Rakesh Kilaru
Wilkinson Walsh and Eskovitz LLP
contact info
Seth P. Waxman
WilmerHale
contact info
Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Philip J. Perry
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Paul Wolfson
WilmerHale
contact info
Intervenor - Pending
RALPH A. APPLEGATE
Plaintiff - Appellee
EDWIN HARDEMAN
Represented By
Aimee Wagstaff
Andrus Wagstaff, PC
contact info
Jennifer A. Moore
Moore Law Group, PLLC
contact info
David Wool
Andrus Wagstaff, PC
contact info
Leslie A. Brueckner
Public Justice, PC
contact info

GPO May 14 2021
FILED OPINION (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, N. RANDY SMITH and RYAN D. NELSON) AFFIRMED. Judge: RDN Authoring, Judge: NRS Dissenting. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12112919] [19-16636, 19-16708]

Docket last updated: 05/18/2021 1:33 AM PDT
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/28/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/23/2019. Transcript due 10/22/2019. Appellant Monsanto Company opening brief due 11/22/2019. Appellee Edwin Hardeman answering brief due 12/23/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11405477] (RT) [Entered: 08/21/2019 01:36 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 3 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet