Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:David L Bunning
Referred: Candace J Smith
Case #: 2:19-cv-00114
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2019
Terminated:Nov 08, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2020 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Bilokonsky
Represented By
J. Stan Lee
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Christian G. Caldwell
Represented By
J. Stan Lee
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Executor plaintiff
Shauna Lynne Cayze
Represented By
Todd M. Powers
Schroeder, Maundrell, Barbiere & Powers
contact info
Megan Ahrens Sullivan
Schroeder, Maundrell, Barbiere & Powers
contact info
Plaintiff
Shauna Lynne Cayze
Represented By
Todd M. Powers
Schroeder, Maundrell, Barbiere & Powers
contact info
Megan Ahrens Sullivan
Schroeder, Maundrell, Barbiere & Powers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 08, 2019
10 10 order Agreed Order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/08 9:13 AM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL: by agreement of the Parties in the within cause, all claims asserted herein or which could have been asserted herein by all parties, are hereby DISMISSED, as settled, with prejudice, with each party to pay its own cost. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/7/2019.(KRB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
9 9 motion Proposed Agreed Order Wed 11/06 4:27 PM
Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal by Michael Bilokonsky, Christian G. Caldwell. (Lee, J.)
Related: [-]
8 8 respoth Notice of Appearance Wed 11/06 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Bilokonsky, Christian G. Caldwell. (Lee, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 09/13 10:20 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Exhibit A served on Christian Caldwell on 09/04/2019, filed by Shauna Lynne Cayze. (Powers, Todd)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 09/13 10:19 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Exhibit A served on Michael Bilokonsky on 09/04/2019, filed by Shauna Lynne Cayze. (Powers, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
5 5 respoth Notice of Appearance Fri 08/23 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shauna Lynne Cayze. (Sullivan, Megan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 08/23 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Michael Bilokonsky, Christian G. Caldwell; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KRB)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/23 12:47 PM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 01/13/2011.(KRB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4447360), filed by Shauna Lynne Cayze.(KRB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Order Appointing Fiduciary,
Att: 3 Praecipe to Issue Summons in a Civil Action,
Att: 4 Summons MB,
Att: 5 Summons CC
misc Conflict Check Fri 08/23 12:48 PM
Conflict Check run. (KRB)
Related: [-]