City of Bristol, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45719 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Western, 1:19-cv-00011 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:14 PM EST |
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Bristol, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/26/2019 12:28 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court City of Bristol, Virginia, case number CL 18-240. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00; Rec # 0423-3108845), filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court, City of Bristol, Virginia. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/29/19. (ejs) Modified on 4/1/2019 - corrected signing judge to reflect Judge Dillon instead of Judge Sargent (ejs). [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re1 Supplemental Notice of Removal(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Circuit Court(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Cook Hedblom on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
7 | 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
8 | 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
10 | 10 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
11 | 11 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
12 | 12 Briefing Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/4/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court City of Bristol, Virginia, CL19000324-00, consisting of Original State Court Complaint and State Court Civil Cover Sheet, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.)(ejs) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 State Court Records, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Records, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Records, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Records, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Records, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Records | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
16 | 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
17 | 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122030. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122040. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 MOTION for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3122716. by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21 MOTION to Stay by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22 Brief / Memorandum in Support re21 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
23 | 23 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re9 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Lollar, Tirzah) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Remand | ||
24 | 24 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re10 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
25 | 25 ORAL ORDER granting18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Herman Jordan for Optum, Inc.,OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
26 | 26 ORAL ORDER granting19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kimberly Kisabeth Chemerinsky for Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
27 | 27 ORAL ORDER granting20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian David Boone for Optum, Inc.,Bri OptumRx, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/19/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
28 | 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Bristol, Virginia. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
29 | 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re10 Supplemental MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by City of Bristol, Virginia.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
30 | 30 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re21 Notice of Supplemental Authorities(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
31 | 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Stay . filed by City of Bristol, Virginia.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
32 | 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Stay . filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc..(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
33 | 33 NOTICE by City of Bristol, Virginia re9 ,10 Notice of Supplemental Authority(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
34 | 34 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. re21 Notice of Supplemental Authorities(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
35 | 35 ORDER granting21 Motion to Stay Case and denying as moot11 Motion to Expedite. This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether the case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/16/2019. (ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Munro Scott on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
37 | 37 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. Hedblom Withdrawal of Counsel (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
38 | 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by City of Bristol, Virginia.(Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
39 | 39 ORDER granting38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Tallent Rogers terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/01/2019. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
40 | 40 Notice of MDL Transfer Order from District of Northern Ohio; MDL No. 2804. (aab) [Transferred from vawd on 8/23/2019.] | |
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
41 | 41 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00011. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |