New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Case #: 1:19-cv-07927
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2019
Terminated:Oct 25, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2020 4:07 AM EST
Defendant
Duty Free Americas, Inc.
Represented By
Robert David Garson
Garson, Segal, Steinmetz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eugene Duncan
Represented By
Bradly Gurion Marks
The Marks Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 25, 2019
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 10/25 9:57 AM
ORDER: This Court having been advised that the parties have reached a settlement in principle, the Clerk of the Court is hereby ORDERED to close the above-captioned action, without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if an application to restore is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/24/2019) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/23 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Eugene Duncan. (Rodriguez, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
12 12 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 10/17 3:37 PM
DECLARATION of Milton Chiz in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Duty Free Americas, Inc.. (Garson, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 13 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 10/17 3:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Duty Free Americas, Inc..(Garson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A
10 10 motion Dismiss Thu 10/17 3:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Duty Free Americas, Inc.. Responses due by 11/8/2019(Garson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 10/07 11:17 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Duty Free Americas, Inc. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, legal clerk. Document filed by Eugene Duncan. (Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
8 8 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/03 10:42 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties herein, that the Defendant's time to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is hereby extended to and including October 18, 2019. Plaintiffs filed the underlying Complaint in this action on August 23, 2019 and Defendant was served with process on September 13, 2019 and the response to the Complaint is due on October 4, 2019, which counsel have agreed to extend until October 18, 2019. (Duty Free Americas, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/3/2019) (jwh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
7 7 misc Letter Tue 10/01 10:16 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robert Garson dated October 1, 2019 re: Extension to Answer or otherwise move. Document filed by Duty Free Americas, Inc..(Garson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/27 11:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Duty Free Americas, Inc.. (gp)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 08/27 11:04 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/26/2019) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/26 10:19 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Duty Free Americas, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Eugene Duncan. (Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/26 9:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/26 9:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/26 9:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 08/26 9:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bradly Gurion Marks. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 08/26 9:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bradly Gurion Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Duty Free Americas, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/26 9:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bradly Gurion Marks to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the name of the defendant was not entered in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/23 2:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Duty Free America, Inc, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Eugene Duncan. (Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/23 2:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 2:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Duty Free America, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17484125)Document filed by Eugene Duncan.(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]