Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03259
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2019
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2020 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER SOIT
Represented By
EDWARD ANTHONY WALLACE
Wexler Wallace Llp - Chicago Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Sun 05/15 11:53 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/05 12:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CHRISTOPHER SOIT. (WALLACE, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/26 10:59 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/23 1:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WALLACE, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 1:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4599227.), filed by CHRISTOPHER SOIT. (WALLACE, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 08/26 7:39 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON and JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]