KARIDISl v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-03277 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02227 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2020 3:18 AM EST |
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
ADAM KARIDIS
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
EDWARD JACKSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN HOLMES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MATTHEW IPPOLITO
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RYAN HUMPHRIES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIAN HUMMER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT HULLER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA HUGHES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HUDSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW HUDSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEIF HORTON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN HONSE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SETH HINZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMIE JANDA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IVAN JIMENEZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK JOHNSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSE JOHNSTON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER JOLLY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUSTIN JONES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LOWELL JONES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRAVIS JONES
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN JONESBURG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALFRED KAMMEYER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AUSTIN KANG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN HINDS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KURT GUDENKAUF
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRANDON GULLEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GAYLORD GUNDER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS GURY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA GUY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRED HAGER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HAHNEBOHM
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONALD HAMMOCK
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID HANKS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY HARDISTY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY HARTUNG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATHANIEL HAWKINS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACOB HELIE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HELLUMS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HELM
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES HENRY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA HERNANDEZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RODULFO HERNANDEZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAIME HERNANDEZ-GOMEZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM HERR
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM HERRERA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSE HEWSON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTIAN HIDALGO
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARNE HIETALA
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATRICK HOLLIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ADAM KARIDIS. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VIRGINIA E ANELLO on behalf of ADAM KARIDIS (ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. GAYLORD GUNDER, THOMAS GURY, JOSHUA GUY, FRED HAGER, MICHAEL HAHNEBOHM, DONALD HAMMOCK, DAVID HANKS, JEREMY HARDISTY, TIMOTHY HARTUNG, NATHANIEL HAWKINS, JACOB HELIE, MICHAEL HELLUMS, MICHAEL HELM, CHARLES HENRY, JOSHUA HERNANDEZ, RODULFO HERNANDEZ, JAIME HERNANDEZ-GOMEZ, WILLIAM HERR, WILLIAM HERRERA, JESSE HEWSON, CHRISTIAN HIDALGO, ARNE HIETALA, KEVIN HINDS, SETH HINZ, PATRICK HOLLIS, BRIAN HOLMES, JOHN HONSE, LEIF HORTON, ANDREW HUDSON, MICHAEL HUDSON, JOSHUA HUGHES, ROBERT HULLER, BRIAN HUMMER, RYAN HUMPHRIES, MATTHEW IPPOLITO, EDWARD JACKSON, JAMIE JANDA, IVAN JIMENEZ, MARK JOHNSON, JESSE JOHNSTON, CHRISTOPHER JOLLY, JUSTIN JONES, LOWELL JONES, TRAVIS JONES, JOHN JONESBURG, ALFRED KAMMEYER, AUSTIN KANG, KURT GUDENKAUF and BRANDON GULLEY terminated. (djb) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02227. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier; K. Rachal Lanier; Cristina Delise; Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2227 (SRN/TNL). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |