WELANDER et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-03330 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02264 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2020 4:22 AM EST |
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
NATHANIAL WELANDER
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
ERNEST VALINE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID SWEENEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON TYGER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY TUCK
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VERNON TROZZI
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KENNETH TOWNSEND
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT TOLTZ
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSHUA TISOSKEY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CODY THORPE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KYLE THERRIEN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEREMY TEAL
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL SULLIVAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL VANN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT VARNER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID VAUGHN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SEAN VERSLUIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAN VIZE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN WAGASKY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TORY WALL
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LARRY WALLS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BOB WARD
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RYAN WARD
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON WARNER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GREGORY SULLIVAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COTY SKINNER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN SLATE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEAN SMITH
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN M SMITH
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN SMITH
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRACY SMITH
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW SPARROW
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COREY SPECK
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MATT STACY
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SCOTTY STANDRIDGE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLINTON STAYTON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM STEELE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADAM STEINBACHER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY STEVENS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KARL STEWART
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT STLOUIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRADFORD STOCKMAN
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACK STONE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BARRY STONGE
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL STREETER
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL STURGEON
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JASON STURGIS
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LUIS SUAREZHARASIC
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID SUGG
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN SUMMITT
Terminated: 10/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd) |
|
Sunday, November 03, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NATHANIAL WELANDER. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by VIRGINIA E ANELLO on behalf of NATHANIAL WELANDER (ANELLO, VIRGINIA) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. DEAN SMITH, JOHN M SMITH, KEVIN SMITH, TRACY SMITH, ANDREW SPARROW, COREY SPECK, MATT STACY, SCOTTY STANDRIDGE, CLINTON STAYTON, WILLIAM STEELE, ADAM STEINBACHER, ANTHONY STEVENS, KARL STEWART, ROBERT STLOUIS, BRADFORD STOCKMAN, JACK STONE, BARRY STONGE, PAUL STREETER, MICHAEL STURGEON, JASON STURGIS, LUIS SUAREZHARASIC, DAVID SUGG, GREGORY SULLIVAN, MICHAEL SULLIVAN, STEPHEN SUMMITT, DAVID SWEENEY, JEREMY TEAL, KYLE THERRIEN, CODY THORPE, JOSHUA TISOSKEY, ROBERT TOLTZ, KENNETH TOWNSEND, VERNON TROZZI, JEREMY TUCK, JASON TYGER, ERNEST VALINE, DANIEL VANN, ROBERT VARNER, DAVID VAUGHN, SEAN VERSLUIS, DAN VIZE, STEPHEN WAGASKY, TORY WALL, LARRY WALLS, BOB WARD, RYAN WARD, JASON WARNER, COTY SKINNER and STEVEN SLATE terminated. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (djb) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02264. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-31) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to The Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/28/2019.] |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier, K. Rachel Lanier, Cristina Delise, Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/28/2019.] | |
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2264 (SRN-ECW). (MKB)[Transferred from Minnesota on 8/28/2019.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |