Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03341
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2019
Case in other court:Delaware, 1:19-cv-01532
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2020 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
JOE ARAGON
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
MICHELLE BARBEE
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVE EHNES
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY IPPOLITO
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM O'BRIEN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBRA SMITH
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHIE SUPER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBORAH WIETING
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MABLE WILLIANS
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSAN WRIGHT
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK YOUNGBLOOD
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 11, 2020
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/11 4:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOE ARAGON. (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/08 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of JOE ARAGON (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
19 19 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 12/17 2:28 PM
ORDER - The Clerk is directed to sever each plaintiff in the cases identified on Exhibit A, other than the first plaintiff named in the original complaint, assign separate civil action numbers to each severed plaintiff, and associate his or her each new case with the master docket for the MDL, 3:16md2734. ANTHONY IPPOLITO, WILLIAM O'BRIEN, DEBRA SMITH, KATHIE SUPER, DEBORAH WIETING, MABLE WILLIANS, SUSAN WRIGHT, MARK YOUNGBLOOD, MICHELLE BARBEE and STEVE EHNES terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (Clerk will assign case numbers. Counsel will be notified of new case through NEF) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 11/18 7:35 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:18 Response to Order to Show Cause,16 Order,17 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
18 18 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 11/15 6:34 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JOE ARAGON, MICHELLE BARBEE, STEVE EHNES, ANTHONY IPPOLITO, WILLIAM O'BRIEN, DEBRA SMITH, KATHIE SUPER, DEBORAH WIETING, MABLE WILLIANS, SUSAN WRIGHT, MARK YOUNGBLOOD. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 11/15 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by STEVE EHNES, WILLIAM O'BRIEN, KATHIE SUPER, MABLE WILLIANS, SUSAN WRIGHT, MARK YOUNGBLOOD (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
16 16 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/28 2:22 PM
ORDER - Defendants' 12 and 14 Motions for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs are GRANTED. The individual plaintiffs identified on Exhibits A and B are herebyORDERED to show cause why their cases should not be dismissedwith prejudice for failure to comply with orders of the Court, by 11/15/2019 . The plaintiffs' responses to this show cause ordermust be filed on the docket for this individual case only. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/28/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
14 14 motion Show Cause Wed 10/16 1:39 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 10/16 4:30 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 10/15 8:07 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:9 Notice of Attorney Certification by Joe Aragon,10 Notice of Attorney Certification by Michelle Barbee,7 Notice of Attorney Certification by Deborah Wieting,6 Notice of Attorney Certification by Anthony Ippolito,8 Notice of Attorney Certification by Debra Smith (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/14 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER R LIAKOS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 10/11 8:35 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
12 12 motion Show Cause Thu 10/10 6:29 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
11 11 misc Docket Annotation Wed 10/09 8:09 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Attorney Jennifer Liakos - Please enter a notice of appearance on behalf of plaintiffs re: Certifications filed 10/8/2019 re: docket entries6 through10 . (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:27 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by MICHELLE BARBEE (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by JOE ARAGON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:25 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by DEBRA SMITH (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by DEBORAH WIETING (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:23 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by ANTHONY IPPOLITO (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 08/29 10:36 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/29 9:57 AM
Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01532. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 10:08 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/27/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Case transferred to United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01531-RGA, 1:19-cv-01532-RGA, 1:19-cv-01533-RGA, 1:19-cv-01534-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2710182) - filed by Debra Smith, Mark Youngblood, Michelle Barbee, Anthony Ippolito, William O'Brien, Mable Willians, Deborah Wieting, Joe Aragon, Susan Wright, Kathie Super, and Steve Ehnes.(amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
No Summons Issued. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]