Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Est v. ASC Ticket Co., LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01342 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ASC Ticket Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC
26 Court Street
Brooklyn, NY 11242 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/13 10:07 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1342 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna) |
||
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 01/10 5:05 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Trustee's Adversary Proceeding as Against ASC Ticket Co., LLC with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7041(a)(1)(A) filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order, Approving Settlement
Fri 01/10 12:48 PM
Order Approving Settlement signed on 1/10/2020 Between the Trustee and ASC Ticket Co., LLC, And Authorizing the Trustee to Consummate the Terms Thereof. (Rodriguez, Maria) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Fri 01/10 10:31 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Certificate of No Objection With Respect to the Notice of Trustee's Settlement of Claims Asserted Against ASC Ticket Co., LLC Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Kiss, Lauren) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 12/19 10:55 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Wed 12/18 2:16 PM
Letter Notice of (I) Trustee's Settlement of Claims Asserts Against ASC Ticket Co., LLC, (II) Presentment of Form of Order Approving the Settlement, and (III) Opportunity to Object to the Proposed Settlement and Obtain a Hearing Date Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. Objections due by 1/7/2020,(Kiss, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 10/02 2:29 PM
Stipulation and Order, Signed on 10/2/2019, Extending the Time of ASC Ticket Co., LLC to Respond to the Trustee's Complaint through and including October 30, 2019. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Wed 09/25 9:42 AM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending the Time of ASC Ticket Co., LLC to Respond to the Trustee's Complaint Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 09/05 11:34 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 08/30 1:33 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG), Answer due by 9/30/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 08/30 1:28 PM
(PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE DOCUMENT # 3 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG), Answer due by 9/30/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) Modified on 8/30/2019 (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 08/28 3:03 PM
Adversary case 19-01342 Complaint against ASC Ticket Co., LLC Seeking the Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent and Preferential Transfers (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Stevens, Fred) |