Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Est v. Kendall Jenner Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01347 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kendall Jenner Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kendall Jenner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC
26 Court Street
Brooklyn, NY 11242 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 06/25 10:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1347 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna) |
||
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order, Approving Settlement
Wed 06/17 10:39 AM
Order, Signed on 6/17/2020, Approving Settlement Between the Trustee, Kendall Jenner, Inc. and Kendall Jenner, and Authorizing the Trustee to Consummate the Terms Thereof. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 06/15 2:41 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Certificate of No Objection with Respect to the Notice of Trustee's Settlement of Claims Asserted Against Kendall Jenner Inc. and Kendall Jenner Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/20 1:01 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mediator's Final Report Settled
Tue 05/19 4:42 PM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by David M. Banker on behalf of David M Banker. (Banker, David) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Tue 05/19 4:08 PM
Notice of Presentment Notice of (I) Trustee's Settlement of Claims Asserted Against Kendall Jenner Inc. and Kendall Jenner, (II) Presentment of Form of Order Approving the Settlement, and (III) Opportunity to Object to the Proposed Settlement and Obtain a Hearing Thereon filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. Objections due by 6/12/2020, |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Mon 01/13 10:02 AM
Letter Notice of Mediator Selection Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Mon 12/30 2:43 PM
Letter Notice of Joint Stipulation to Enter into Mediation Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 10/02 2:07 PM
Stipulation and Order, Signed on 10/2/2019, Extending the Time of Kendall Jenner Inc. and Kendall Jenner to Respond to the Trustee's Complaint through and including October 30, 2019. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/27 9:39 AM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending the Time of Kendall Jenner Inc. and Kendall Jenner to Respond to the Trustee's Complaint Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 09/05 11:41 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 08/30 1:39 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG), Answer due by 9/30/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 08/28 3:42 PM
Adversary case 19-01347 Complaint against Kendall Jenner Inc., Kendall Jenner Seeking the Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Stevens, Fred) |