Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Est v. Yachtlife Technologies, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01352 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Yachtlife Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC
26 Court Street
Brooklyn, NY 11242 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Mon 03/29 3:13 PM
Notice of Dismissal Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7041(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Kiss, Lauren) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/29 4:19 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1352 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna) |
||
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Tue 03/03 4:51 PM
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Order, Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055, Directing the Entry of a Default Judgment Against Defendant Yachtlife Technologies, Inc. filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Kiss, Lauren) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Tue 03/03 4:48 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Motion of Plaintiff Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee, for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055, Directing the Entry of a Default Judgment Against Defendant Yachtlife Technologies, Inc. filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Kiss, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stevens Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Judgment | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Entry of Default | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Complaint | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Service | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Insider Order | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Insider Decision | ||
Sunday, October 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 10/28 12:17 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 10/27/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 10/25 4:07 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against YachtLife Technologies, Inc. (McCaffrey, Dawn) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 10/25 2:48 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant YachtLife Technologies, Inc. filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 09/05 11:47 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 08/30 1:39 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG), Answer due by 9/30/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 08/28 4:05 PM
Adversary case 19-01352 Complaint against Yachtlife Technologies, Inc. Seeking (I) Turnover of Property of the Estate; and (II) The Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent and/or Preferential Transfers (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Stevens, Fred) |