Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Est v. Lavi
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11883
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01353 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Yaron Lavi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC
26 Court Street
Brooklyn, NY 11242 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Thu 01/02 10:36 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Trustee's Adversary Proceeding as Against Yaron Lavi Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 7041(a)(1)(A) filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/02 2:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1353 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna) |
||
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 10/02 2:20 PM
Stipulation and Order, signed on 10/2/2019, Extending the Time of Yaron Lavi to Respond to the Trustee's Complaint through and including October 30, 2019. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 09/24 5:31 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Paul H. Aloe on behalf of Yaron Lavi. (Aloe, Paul) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Mon 09/23 5:39 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending the Time of Yaron Lavi to Respond to the Trustee's Complaint Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 09/05 11:49 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Christopher J Reilly on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 08/30 1:39 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG), Answer due by 9/30/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 08/28 4:08 PM
Adversary case 19-01353 Complaint against Yaron Lavi Seeking the Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent and Preferential Transfers (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Gregory M. Messer, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Fyre Festival LLC. (Stevens, Fred) |