Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03343
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2019
Terminated:Aug 03, 2020
Case in other court:Delaware, 1:19-cv-01534
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2020 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
KATIE HERBRAND
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
ANDREW JOLICOEUR
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MOERIO ZEIGLER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KERRI SULLIVAN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALICIA SPITZ
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KERI SIMMERER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEBBIE SANCHEZ
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARILYN ROWE
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT REARDON
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN MUCCIO
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN MOAK
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TORRENNA MACCONNEL
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ASHLEY LOVELL
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL HANKARD
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN GOLEMBA
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNA FERRIS
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ADA DROE
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURA DILTZ
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL CURLEE, SR.
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BETTY CORBETT
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEVLYN ASBERRY
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURA ALVARADO
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 03, 2020
24 24 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/04 10:22 AM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
23 23 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 07/20 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by KATIE HERBRAND (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
22 22 3 pgs order Order Fri 07/17 3:02 PM
ORDER granting 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by KATIE HERBRAND. Counsel is directed to promptly provide the plaintiffs with a copy of this Order and to file a written notice of compliance with the Court, together with an address for the plaintiffs where all future filings and correspondence involving their cases should be directed. Thereafter, Behram V. Parekh, Esq. and the law firm of Kirtland & Packard LLP are relieved of any further obligation for representation of the plaintiffs in those matters. Unless and until substitute counsel appears on a plaintiff's behalf, the Court will assume the plaintiff has elected to proceed pro se. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/17/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/13 8:37 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/10 3:00 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by KATIE HERBRAND. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
20 20 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/20 11:41 AM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by KATIE HERBRAND (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
18 18 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
17 17 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 01/30 6:12 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by KATIE HERBRAND (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, January 02, 2020
16 16 cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Ot Ph
15 15 cmp Complaint Thu 01/02 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KATIE HERBRAND. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Ot Ph
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 12/31 7:44 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/30 6:07 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by LAURA ALVARADO. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Otsuka Ph
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
12 12 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 12/17 2:33 PM
ORDER - The Clerk is directed to sever each plaintiff in the cases identified on Exhibit A, other than the first plaintiff named in the original complaint, assign separate civil action numbers to each severed plaintiff, and associate his or her each new case with the master docket for the MDL, 3:16md2734. BETTY CORBETT, PAUL CURLEE, SR, LAURA DILTZ, ADA DROE, JENNA FERRIS, JOHN GOLEMBA, DANIEL HANKARD, ANDREW JOLICOEUR, ASHLEY LOVELL, TORRENNA MACCONNEL, JOHN MOAK, JOHN MUCCIO, ROBERT REARDON, MARILYN ROWE, DEBBIE SANCHEZ, KERI SIMMERER, ALICIA SPITZ, KERRI SULLIVAN, MOERIO ZEIGLER, LAURA ALVARADO and DEVLYN ASBERRY terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (Clerk will assign case numbers. Counsel will be notified of new case through NEF) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 11/04 7:34 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:11 Response to Order to Show Cause,10 Order to Show Cause, (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
11 11 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 11/01 6:18 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LAURA ALVARADO, DEVLYN ASBERRY, BETTY CORBETT, PAUL CURLEE, SR, LAURA DILTZ, ADA DROE, JENNA FERRIS, JOHN GOLEMBA, DANIEL HANKARD, KATIE HERBRAND, ANDREW JOLICOEUR, ASHLEY LOVELL, TORRENNA MACCONNEL, JOHN MOAK, JOHN MUCCIO, ROBERT REARDON, MARILYN ROWE, DEBBIE SANCHEZ, KERI SIMMERER, ALICIA SPITZ, KERRI SULLIVAN, MOERIO ZEIGLER. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Monday, October 28, 2019
10 10 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 10/28 1:45 PM
ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Entry of Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs. The individual plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A are hereby ORDERED to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with orders of the Court, by 11/15/2019 . The plaintiffs' responses to this show cause order must be filed on the docket for this individual case only. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/28/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
8 8 motion Show Cause Wed 10/16 1:45 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 10/16 4:31 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/03 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BEHRAM V PAREKH on behalf of LAURA ALVARADO, DEVLYN ASBERRY, BETTY CORBETT, PAUL CURLEE, SR, LAURA DILTZ, ADA DROE, JENNA FERRIS, JOHN GOLEMBA, DANIEL HANKARD, KATIE HERBRAND, ANDREW JOLICOEUR, ASHLEY LOVELL, TORRENNA MACCONNEL, JOHN MOAK, JOHN MUCCIO, ROBERT REARDON, MARILYN ROWE, DEBBIE SANCHEZ, KERI SIMMERER, ALICIA SPITZ, KERRI SULLIVAN, MOERIO ZEIGLER (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 10/03 12:29 PM
NOTICE of ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION FOR FEBRUARY 25, 2019 ORDER REGARDING CASE REVIEW PROCESS by DEVLYN ASBERRY, BETTY CORBETT, PAUL CURLEE, SR, LAURA DILTZ, ADA DROE, JENNA FERRIS, JOHN GOLEMBA, DANIEL HANKARD, KATIE HERBRAND, ANDREW JOLICOEUR, ASHLEY LOVELL, TORRENNA MACCONNEL, JOHN MOAK, JOHN MUCCIO, ROBERT REARDON, MARILYN ROWE, DEBBIE SANCHEZ, KERI SIMMERER, ALICIA SPITZ, KERRI SULLIVAN, MOERIO ZEIGLER (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 10/03 2:36 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:6 Attorney Certification for February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 08/29 10:32 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/29 10:12 AM
Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01534. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 10:12 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/27/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/29 10:13 AM
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01531-RGA, 1:19-cv-01532-RGA, 1:19-cv-01533-RGA, 1:19-cv-01534-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2710184.) - filed by Kerri Sullivan, Jenna Ferris, Betty Corbett, Laura Diltz, Marilyn Rowe, Devlyn Asberry, Katie Herbrand, Debbie Sanchez, Ashley Lovell, Keri Simmerer, John Golemba, Andrew Jolicoeur, Paul Curlee, Sr, John Muccio, Alicia Spitz, Daniel Hankard, Robert Reardon, Laura Alvarado, Moerio Zeigler, Torrenna Macconnel, Ada Droe, John Moak. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
No Summons Issued. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]