Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03356
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2019
Terminated:Oct 18, 2019
Case in other court:Connecticut, 3:19-cv-01253
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2020 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
SEAN ROSEN
Represented By
LAURA RAYMOND
The Reardon Law Firm Pc - New London Ct
contact info
Kelly E. Reardon
The Reardon Law Firm P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2019
19 19 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 10/18 2:31 PM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/15 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SEAN ROSEN (RAYMOND, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
17 17 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Thu 09/05 2:30 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by SEAN ROSEN. Amendment to16 Notice of Appearance in Substitution . (RAYMOND, LAURA)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA RAYMOND on behalf of SEAN ROSEN (RAYMOND, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
15 15 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 08/30 8:32 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
14 14 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/29 2:00 PM
Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01253. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 1:08 PM
MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to District Court for the Northern District of Florida. signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel.(Murphy, Tatihana)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
12 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
11 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. 3M Company served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
Thursday, August 15, 2019
10 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
9 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo Intermediate, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. Aearo Holding LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Rosen. 3M Occupational Safety LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
6 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelly E. Reardon* *The Reardon Law Firm P.C.* *160 Hempstead Street* *New London, CT 06320*. (Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Electronic Filing Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by Sean Rosen,4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
4 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5394941.), filed by Sean Rosen. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC. Related [+] [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-] ardon, Kelly
Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]