Covington County, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45751 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Middle, 2:19-cv-00544 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Covington County, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 2:29 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Covington County, Alabama. (NO PDF attached - See doc1 ). (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 153 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., & Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by Covington County, Alabama. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054378.)(am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Covington County, Alabama. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and mailed CMRRR w/copy of1 Complaint &2 Corp Disclosure. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
7 | 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Kelly Webster for Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
8 | 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
9 | 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Kelly Webster for McKesson Corporation served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
10 | 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Noramco, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
12 | 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Julie Buckner for Cephalon, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
13 | 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
15 | 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Sheila Wilks for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Johnson & Johnson served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
18 | 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by Marilyn Pahla for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
19 | 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Actavis, LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by CT Corporation for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by CT Corporation for Mallinckrodt LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
22 | 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with the following notation, "Return to Sender - Unable to Forward;" Counsel is notified via this notice regarding un-perfected service. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (NO PDF attached to this entry). (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | ||
23 | 23 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 8/15/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint, & Corporate Disclosure Statement signed by CT Corporation for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/7/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from almd on 8/29/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
25 | 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Middle. Case number 2:19-cv-00544. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |