California Central District Court
Judge:Cormac J Carney
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:19-cv-07512
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2019
Terminated:Oct 24, 2019
Case in other court:Southern District, 19STCV23002
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2020 1:13 AM PST
Defendant
Jemma Contreras
Defendant
Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Anahi Cruz
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Jennifer B Zargarof
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Anahi Gonzalez
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Joseph D Hadacek
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Inventiv Health Inc.
Represented By
Anahi Cruz
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Jennifer B Zargarof
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Anahi Gonzalez
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Joseph D Hadacek
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Landers
Plaintiff
Amy Tan
Represented By
Kevin Won Suk Chiang
Equity Legal Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 08, 2019
18 18 misc Receipt Fri 11/08 4:58 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19STCV23002, acknowledged on 10/29/2019. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
17 17 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form Fri 10/25 9:40 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
16 16 order Remand Case to State Court Fri 10/25 9:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND [Dkt. 12] by Judge Cormac J. Carney granting12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court: For the following reasons, Plaintiffs motion to remand is GRANTED. This action is hereby remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (see document for further details) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
15 15 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 10/21 12:19 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Plaintiff Amy Tan. (Chiang, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
14 14 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 10/11 4:30 PM
Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., Inventiv Health Inc.. (Zargarof, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 09/30 2:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amy Tan, (Chiang, Kevin)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Remand Case to State Court Mon 09/30 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Amy Tan. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Chiang, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of K. Chiang in support of Motion for Remand,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Remand,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Friday, September 20, 2019
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 09/20 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on November 14, 2019. (gga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 09/18 8:00 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-07512 CJC (ASx). (esa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
9 9 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final Tue 09/17 10:25 PM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Amy Tan. (Chiang, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement Tue 09/17 12:37 PM
STATEMENT Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., Inventiv Health Inc. (Zargarof, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 09/06 12:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., Inventiv Health Inc., for Notice of Notice of Removal and Notices [Docs 5 & 6] served on 9/3/19 & 9/6/19. (Gonzalez, Anahi)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Fri 09/06 10:42 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 09/03 9:23 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Friday, August 30, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/30 9:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., Inventiv Health Inc., identifying Syneos Health, Inc.. (Zargarof, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 08/29 5:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., Inventiv Health Inc.. (Zargarof, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Thu 08/29 5:11 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer B. Zargarof re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., Inventiv Health Inc.. (Zargarof, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/29 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV23002 Receipt No: 0973-24353545 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., Inventiv Health Inc.. (Attorney Jennifer B Zargarof added to party Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer B Zargarof added to party Inventiv Health Inc.(pty:dft))(Zargarof, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 09/03 9:12 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Amy Tan in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/28/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 09/03 9:20 AM
CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Inventiv Health Consulting, Inc., and Inventiv Health Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/28/2019, attached as Exhibit 2.(jtil)
Related: [-]