Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:19-cv-03901
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2019
Terminated:Sep 29, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2020 3:19 AM EST
Defendant
NexAir, LLC
Represented By
Hannah Elizabeth Jarrells
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.-Ga
contact info
David E. Gevertz
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, Pc- Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Norton
Represented By
Michael D. Cross, Jr.
Briskin, Cross & Sanford, LLC
contact info
Robert Kyle Paske
Briskin, Cross & Sanford, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Norton
Represented By
Michael D. Cross, Jr.
Briskin, Cross & Sanford, LLC
contact info
Robert Kyle Paske
Briskin, Cross & Sanford, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, September 29, 2022
106 106 misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 09/29 11:04 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (ceo)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 09/29 11:02 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING105 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/29 11:06 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
105 105 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/28 10:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Dismissal of nexAir's Remaining Counterclaims Without Prejudice by NexAir, LLC, NexAir, LLC. (Gevertz, David)
Related: [-]