Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan R Bolton
Case #: 2:14-cv-00484
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2014
Terminated:Jun 03, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 9:48 AM MST
Defendant
Jerod Bybee
Represented By
Charles Jameson Gibbs
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Galen Huntington Satterlee
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Thomas Lee Toone
Beer & Toone PC
contact info
Christian Knut Gamble Henrichsen
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Defendant
CAE Oxford Aviation Academy Phoenix Incorporated
Represented By
Charles Jameson Gibbs
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Galen Huntington Satterlee
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Thomas Lee Toone
Beer & Toone PC
contact info
Christian Knut Gamble Henrichsen
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Represented By
Charles Jameson Gibbs
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Galen Huntington Satterlee
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Thomas Lee Toone
Beer & Toone PC
contact info
Christian Knut Gamble Henrichsen
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen S Edwards
1765 N Lemon St.
Mesa, AZ 85205


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, June 03, 2014
13 13 ORDER granting6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/3/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 27, 2014
12 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jerod Bybee, CAE Oxford Aviation Academy Phoenix Incorporated. (Henrichsen, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2014
11 11 RESPONSE to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stephen S Edwards. (ALS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2014
10 10 ORDER denying9 Plaintiff's Motion for Full Reconsideration to Reverse Decision for Judge Susan Bolton to Recuse Herself 2nd Request [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/23/14.(MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2014
9 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re:8 Order on Motion for Recusal by Stephen S Edwards. (ALS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2014
8 8 ORDER denying5 Plaintiff's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 455 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/16/14.(MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2014
7 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint6 no later than April 30, 2014 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/1/14. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2014
6 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jerod Bybee, CAE Oxford Aviation Academy Phoenix Incorporated. (Henrichsen, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2014
5 5 MOTION for Recusal by Stephen S Edwards. (ALS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2014
4 4 SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons upon CAE Oxford Aviation Academy Phoenix Incorporated on 3/11/2014. (ALS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2014
3 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL that the Honorable Paul G. Rosenblatt recuses himself from this action and that this action is reassigned by automated random selection to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed and/or served in this action shall be captioned with case number CV 14-00484 PHX SRB. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/11/2014. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2014
2 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX143915. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 14-00484 PHX-PGR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX143915 filed by Stephen S Edwards.(BAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 civil cover sheet
Summons Issued as to Jerod Bybee, CAE Oxford Aviation Academy Phoenix Incorporated at case opening. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]