California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:19-cv-04073
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2020 1:05 AM PST
Amicus
Blaine Bookey
Represented By
Blaine Meredith Bookey
The Center For Gender And Refugee Studies
contact info
Amicus
Former BIA Members, Former Immigration Law Judges, and Law Professors
Represented By
Marienna Harnden Murch
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
John P. Sanders
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
James McHenry
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
William Barr
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Matthew T. Albence
Represented By
Erez R. Reuveni
United States Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Francesca M Genova
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Colin A. Kisor
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Scott G. Stewart
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Innovation Law Lab
Represented By
Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Omar C. Jadwat
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Julie Michelle Veroff
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Vasudha Talla
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Katrina Leigh Eiland
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Anand Balakrishnan
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Melissa E Crow
American Immigration Council
contact info
Lee Gelernt
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Angelica Salceda
Aclu Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Christine Patricia Sun
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Mary Catherine Bauer
Southern Poverty Law Center
contact info
Cody H. Wofsy
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Plaintiff
East Bay Sanctuary Covenant
Represented By
Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Omar C. Jadwat
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Julie Michelle Veroff
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Vasudha Talla
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Katrina Leigh Eiland
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Anand Balakrishnan
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Melissa E Crow
American Immigration Council
contact info
Lee Gelernt
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Angelica Salceda
Aclu Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Christine Patricia Sun
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Mary Catherine Bauer
Southern Poverty Law Center
contact info
Cody H. Wofsy
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Central American Resource Center
Represented By
Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Omar C. Jadwat
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Julie Michelle Veroff
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Vasudha Talla
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Katrina Leigh Eiland
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Anand Balakrishnan
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Melissa E Crow
American Immigration Council
contact info
Lee Gelernt
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Angelica Salceda
Aclu Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Christine Patricia Sun
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Mary Catherine Bauer
Southern Poverty Law Center
contact info
Cody H. Wofsy
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Al Otro Lado
Represented By
Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Omar C. Jadwat
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Julie Michelle Veroff
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Vasudha Talla
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Katrina Leigh Eiland
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Anand Balakrishnan
Aclu Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Melissa E Crow
American Immigration Council
contact info
Lee Gelernt
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
Angelica Salceda
Aclu Of Northern California, Inc.
contact info
Christine Patricia Sun
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Mary Catherine Bauer
Southern Poverty Law Center
contact info
Cody H. Wofsy
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info

GPO Jul 24 2019
ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar re: 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
GPO Aug 19 2019
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 19, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
GPO Oct 17 2020
igar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2020. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2020)ORDER GRANTING 95 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Responses re: preliminary injunction due by 10/23/2020. Replies due by 10/26/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon S. T
GPO Dec 13 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING STAY. Show Cause Response due by 12/23/2023. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 13, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2023)
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
oth_evt ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/17 8:06 AM
Set Deadline/Hearing re 167 ORDER. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2025 at 02:00 - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 09/22/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
167 167 order Order Fri 03/14 1:52 PM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE At the parties' joint request, the case management conference scheduled for March 17, 2025 is continued to September 23, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. An updated joint case management statement is due September 16, 2025. The previously-ordered stay remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Tigar, Jon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
166 166 misc Case Management Statement Tue 03/11 10:06 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Al Otro Lado, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center. (Gelernt, Lee) Modified on 3/11/2025. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]